Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 18:37:34 (UTC).

Joan Rosetti et al - v. - Town of Guilderland et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 Joan Rosetti filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Town of Guilderland. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8-17

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Albany County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Joan Rosetti

Rosetti Family Irrevocable Trust

Defendants

Town of Guilderland

Assessor of the Town of Guilderland

Board of Assessment Review

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BROWNE, ERIKA C

Attorney at GOLDMAN ATTORNEYS PLLC

GOLDMAN, PAUL J

Attorney at Goldman Attorneys PLLC

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER stipulation & order of settlement-entered by the clerk

ORDER - OTHER stipulation & order of settlement-entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

ORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Browne, E.; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/06/2018; Received: 06/06/2018

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/17/2018; Received: 04/17/2018

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/27/2018; Received: 02/27/2018

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/24/2018; Received: 01/24/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY Letter Extension Order, So Ordered on 10/3/17

NOTICE OF ENTRY Letter Extension Order, So Ordered on 10/3/17; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service on the County Finance Director and the School District

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service on the County Finance Director and the School District; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service upon the Agent for the Assessor

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service upon the Agent for the Assessor; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Determination

EXHIBIT(S) - B Determination; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A Complaint; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1); Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER stipulation & order of settlement-entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Browne, E.; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/06/2018; Received: 06/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/17/2018; Received: 04/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/27/2018; Received: 02/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/24/2018; Received: 01/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Letter Extension Order, So Ordered on 10/3/17; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 10/05/2017; Received: 10/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service on the County Finance Director and the School District; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service upon the Agent for the Assessor; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Determination; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Complaint; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1); Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less