This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:12:16 (UTC).

Jimmy Wilson Jr. - v. - FC 233 LLC

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 Jimmy Wilson Jr filed an Other lawsuit against FC 233 LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jimmy Wilson JR.

Defendant

FC 233 LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARKOVITS, THOMAS P

Attorney at MIRMAN MARKOVITS AND LANDAU PC

Defendant Attorneys

MILLER, JEFFREY T

Attorney at PILLINGER MILLER TARALLO, LLP

HEBNER, ROSEMARIE CARMELLA

Attorney at O'TOOLE SCRIVO LLC

MILLER, JEFFREY TODD

Attorney at PILLINGER MILLER TARALLO, LLP

CAPASSO, ANTHONY D

Attorney at O'TOOLE SCRIVO FERNANDEZ WEINER VAN LIEU LLC

 

Court Documents

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 01/08/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 01/08/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/10/2018; Received: 02/16/2018

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dated 5/17/18

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dated 5/17/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/21/2018; Received: 05/25/2018

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Hebner, R.; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Miller, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 10/26/2017; Received: 10/26/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Markovits, T. - filed by PM Investigations; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Capasso, A.; Filed: 04/24/2018; Received: 04/24/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Miller, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 01/04/2018; Received: 01/04/2018

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Prelim Conf

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Prelim Conf; Filed By: Markovits, T.; Filed: 11/17/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

RESPONSE TO DEMAND response to notice to admit

RESPONSE TO DEMAND response to notice to admit; Filed By: Miller, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 01/04/2018; Received: 01/04/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Markovits, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Miller, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 10/26/2017; Received: 10/26/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Markovits, T. - filed by PM Investigations; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE RJI

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE RJI; Filed By: Markovits, T.; Filed: 11/17/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Miller, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Miller, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Capasso, A.; Filed: 04/24/2018; Received: 04/24/2018

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Hebner, R.; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dated 5/17/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/21/2018; Received: 05/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Capasso, A.; Filed: 04/24/2018; Received: 04/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Capasso, A.; Filed: 04/24/2018; Received: 04/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 01/08/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/10/2018; Received: 02/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Miller, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 01/04/2018; Received: 01/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND response to notice to admit; Filed By: Miller, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 01/04/2018; Received: 01/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE RJI; Filed By: Markovits, T.; Filed: 11/17/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Prelim Conf; Filed By: Markovits, T.; Filed: 11/17/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Miller, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Miller, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Miller, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 10/26/2017; Received: 10/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Miller, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 10/26/2017; Received: 10/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Markovits, T. - filed by PM Investigations; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Markovits, T. - filed by PM Investigations; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Markovits, T.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less