Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 16:16:59 (UTC).

Jillian A. Volpe - v. - James J. Bascone

Case Summary

On 05/24/2017 Jillian A Volpe filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against James J Bascone. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jillian A. Volpe

Defendant

James J. Bascone

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DREYER, DARRYL JOSEPH

Attorney at DREYER LAW OFFICES PLLC

Defendant Attorney

MANSON, DAVID B

Attorney at MANSON & MCCARTHY

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Manson, D.; Filed: 08/30/2018; Received: 08/30/2018

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/19/2018; Received: 06/19/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Dreyer, D.; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) Defendant's EBT Trans

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) Defendant's EBT Trans; Filed By: Dreyer, D.; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Plaintiff's Affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Plaintiff's Affidavit; Filed By: Dreyer, D.; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Plaintiff's EBT Trans

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Plaintiff's EBT Trans; Filed By: Dreyer, D.; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Def Response BPAD

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Def Response BPAD; Filed By: Dreyer, D.; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Verified BP Possible SSN Administratively Redacted

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Verified BP Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Dreyer, D.; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Answer; Filed By: Dreyer, D.; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) S&C

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) S&C Filed By: Dreyer, D.; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Police Report

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Police Report; Filed By: Dreyer, D.; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Dreyer, D.; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Dreyer, D.; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Dreyer, D.; Filed: 02/22/2018; Received: 02/22/2018

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Dreyer, D.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Dreyer, D.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

ANSWER Answer and Demands

ANSWER Answer and Demands; Filed By: Manson, D.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Manson, D.; Filed: 08/30/2018; Received: 08/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/19/2018; Received: 06/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Dreyer, D.; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) Defendant's EBT Trans; Filed By: Dreyer, D.; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Plaintiff's Affidavit; Filed By: Dreyer, D.; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Plaintiff's EBT Trans; Filed By: Dreyer, D.; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Def Response BPAD; Filed By: Dreyer, D.; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Verified BP Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Dreyer, D.; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Answer; Filed By: Dreyer, D.; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) S&C Filed By: Dreyer, D.; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Police Report; Filed By: Dreyer, D.; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Dreyer, D.; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Dreyer, D.; Filed: 03/26/2018; Received: 03/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Dreyer, D.; Filed: 02/22/2018; Received: 02/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Dreyer, D.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Dreyer, D.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer and Demands; Filed By: Manson, D.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Dreyer, D.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less