This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 05/10/2020 at 14:15:53 (UTC).

JHPDE FINANCE I, LLC - v. - CHAD ARMSTRONG

Case Summary

On 09/17/2018 JHPDE FINANCE I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHAD ARMSTRONG. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7-18

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JHPDE FINANCE I, LLC

Defendant

Chad Armstrong

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARASZEWSKI, DARLEEN VERONICA

Defendant Attorney

BASEDOW, STEPHEN WILLIAM

Attorney at Law Office of Simon Goldenberg, PLLC

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Loretto, H.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Loretto, H.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Mandarich Law Group LLP; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Mandarich Law Group LLP; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Mandarich Law Group, LLP; Filed: 11/16/2018; Received: 11/16/2018

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Mandarich Law Group, LLP; Filed: 11/16/2018; Received: 11/16/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Basedow, S. - filed by Law Office of Simon Goldenberg, PLLC; Filed: 11/05/2018; Received: 11/05/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Basedow, S. - filed by Law Office of Simon Goldenberg, PLLC; Filed: 11/05/2018; Received: 11/05/2018

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Basedow, S. - filed by Law Office of Simon Goldenberg, PLLC; Filed: 11/05/2018; Received: 11/05/2018

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/31/2018; Received: 10/31/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 10/30/2018; Received: 10/30/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 09/17/2018; Received: 09/17/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 09/17/2018; Received: 09/17/2018

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Loretto, H.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Loretto, H.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Mandarich Law Group LLP; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Mandarich Law Group LLP; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Mandarich Law Group, LLP; Filed: 11/16/2018; Received: 11/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by Mandarich Law Group, LLP; Filed: 11/16/2018; Received: 11/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Basedow, S. - filed by Law Office of Simon Goldenberg, PLLC; Filed: 11/05/2018; Received: 11/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Basedow, S. - filed by Law Office of Simon Goldenberg, PLLC; Filed: 11/05/2018; Received: 11/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Basedow, S. - filed by Law Office of Simon Goldenberg, PLLC; Filed: 11/05/2018; Received: 11/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/31/2018; Received: 10/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 10/30/2018; Received: 10/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 09/17/2018; Received: 09/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Karaszewski, D. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 09/17/2018; Received: 09/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less