This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 11/23/2021 at 05:29:44 (UTC).

J.G. WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS, LLC v. R. L. et al

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 J G WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against R L. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Nassau, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Patrick F Macrae. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0803

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Patrick F Macrae

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

J.G. WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS, LLC

Defendants

R. L.

ALLSTATE ASSIGNMENT COMPANY

ALLSTATE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAMERMAN, DINA LEAH

 

Court Documents

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #01) Order - Motion #1

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #01) Order - Motion #1; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/25/2021; Received: 06/25/2021

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Denial Order

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Denial Order; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 06/09/2021; Received: 06/09/2021

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter from Ms. Lebeau

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter from Ms. Lebeau; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/21/2021; Received: 05/21/2021

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #01) Motion rescheduled for June 9, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. by Teams.

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #01) Motion rescheduled for June 9, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. by Teams.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/18/2021; Received: 05/18/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #01) Proof of Uses

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #01) Proof of Uses; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/18/2021; Received: 05/18/2021

AFFIDAVIT Amended Affidavit in Support

AFFIDAVIT Amended Affidavit in Support; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/07/2021; Received: 05/07/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - G Prior

EXHIBIT(S) - G Prior; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/05/2021; Received: 05/05/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - F Prior

EXHIBIT(S) - F Prior; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/05/2021; Received: 05/05/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - E Disclosure Statement

EXHIBIT(S) - E Disclosure Statement; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/05/2021; Received: 05/05/2021

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 04/09/2021; Received: 04/09/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - G Prior

EXHIBIT(S) - G Prior; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 04/09/2021; Received: 04/09/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - F Prior

EXHIBIT(S) - F Prior; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 04/09/2021; Received: 04/09/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - E Disclosure Statement

EXHIBIT(S) - E Disclosure Statement; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 04/09/2021; Received: 04/09/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - D List of Dependents

EXHIBIT(S) - D List of Dependents; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 04/09/2021; Received: 04/09/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - C FedEx Confirmation

EXHIBIT(S) - C FedEx Confirmation; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 04/09/2021; Received: 04/09/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - B Purchase Contract

EXHIBIT(S) - B Purchase Contract; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 04/09/2021; Received: 04/09/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A Payment Schedule

EXHIBIT(S) - A Payment Schedule; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 04/09/2021; Received: 04/09/2021

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 04/09/2021; Received: 04/09/2021

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #01) Order - Motion #1; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/25/2021; Received: 06/25/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Denial Order; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 06/09/2021; Received: 06/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter from Ms. Lebeau; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/21/2021; Received: 05/21/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #01) Motion rescheduled for June 9, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. by Teams.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/18/2021; Received: 05/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #01) Proof of Uses; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/18/2021; Received: 05/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Amended Affidavit in Support; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/07/2021; Received: 05/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G Prior; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/05/2021; Received: 05/05/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Prior; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/05/2021; Received: 05/05/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Disclosure Statement; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/05/2021; Received: 05/05/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D List of Dependents; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/05/2021; Received: 05/05/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Disclosure Statement; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 04/09/2021; Received: 04/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 04/09/2021; Received: 04/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G Prior; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 04/09/2021; Received: 04/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Prior; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 04/09/2021; Received: 04/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Disclosure Statement; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 04/09/2021; Received: 04/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D List of Dependents; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 04/09/2021; Received: 04/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C FedEx Confirmation; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 04/09/2021; Received: 04/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Purchase Contract; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 04/09/2021; Received: 04/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Payment Schedule; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 04/09/2021; Received: 04/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 04/09/2021; Received: 04/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less