This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 15:24:24 (UTC).

J.G. Wentworth Originations, LLC v. Pacific Life and Annuity Company et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 J G Wentworth Originations, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Pacific Life and Annuity Company. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Jack Libert. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Jack Libert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

J.G. Wentworth Originations, LLC

Defendants

Pacific Life and Annuity Services, Inc.

Pacific Life and Annuity Company

William Rivera

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NESTOR, MICHAEL FRANCIS

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL F. NESTOR LLC

 

Court Documents

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/11/2019; Received: 07/11/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E Prior Application for Similar Relief

EXHIBIT(S) - E Prior Application for Similar Relief; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D Notice Letter

EXHIBIT(S) - D Notice Letter; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Evidence of Entitlement to Annuity

EXHIBIT(S) - C Evidence of Entitlement to Annuity; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Disclosure Statement

EXHIBIT(S) - B Disclosure Statement; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Purchase Contract

EXHIBIT(S) - A Purchase Contract; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Michael F. Nestor, Esq.

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Michael F. Nestor, Esq.; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Statement of Professional Representation

EXHIBIT(S) - B Statement of Professional Representation; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Disclosure Statement

EXHIBIT(S) - A Disclosure Statement; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of William Rivera

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of William Rivera; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/11/2019; Received: 07/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Prior Application for Similar Relief; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Notice Letter; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Evidence of Entitlement to Annuity; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Disclosure Statement; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Purchase Contract; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation of Michael F. Nestor, Esq.; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Statement of Professional Representation; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Disclosure Statement; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of William Rivera; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less