This case was last updated from Jefferson County New York Courts on 07/15/2023 at 21:56:47 (UTC).

J.G. WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS, LLC v. MATTHEW DAVIES et al

Case Summary

On 05/22/2020 J G WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against MATTHEW DAVIES. This case was filed in Jefferson County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Jefferson, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is James P Mcclusky. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0720

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, New York

Judge Details

Judge

James P Mcclusky

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

J.G. WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS, LLC

Defendants

PACIFIC LIFE AND ANNUITY SERVICES INC

Matthew Davies

PACIFIC LIFE AND ANNUITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAMERMAN, DINA LEAH

 

Court Documents

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/22/2020; Received: 05/22/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A Settlement Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - A Settlement Agreement; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/22/2020; Received: 05/22/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B Affidavit of Matthew Davies

EXHIBIT(S) - B Affidavit of Matthew Davies; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/22/2020; Received: 05/22/2020

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/22/2020; Received: 05/22/2020

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/22/2020; Received: 05/22/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/29/2020; Received: 05/29/2020

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/15/2020; Received: 06/15/2020

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

Proposed Final Order

ORDER - OTHER

--none--

 

Docket Entries

07/09/2020
View Court Documents

DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/09/2020; Received: 07/09/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2020
View Court Documents

DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Final Order; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 07/09/2020; Received: 07/09/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2020
View Court Documents

DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/15/2020; Received: 06/15/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/29/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/29/2020; Received: 05/29/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/22/2020; Received: 05/22/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2020
View Court Documents

DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/22/2020; Received: 05/22/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Affidavit of Matthew Davies; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/22/2020; Received: 05/22/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Settlement Agreement; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/22/2020; Received: 05/22/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2020
View Court Documents

DocketPETITION; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 05/22/2020; Received: 05/22/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less