This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/16/2020 at 01:38:31 (UTC).

J.G. WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS, LLC - v. - ANDREW BAKER et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2017 J G WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against ANDREW BAKER. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

J.G. WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS, LLC

Defendants

Andrew Baker

UNITED STATES LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY IN THE CITY OF NEW YORK

AMERICAN HOME ASSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAMERMAN, DINA LEAH

Attorney at YANKWITT LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM

--none--

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

--none--

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

--none--

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Statement of Professional Representation

EXHIBIT(S)

New York Disclosure Statement

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Prior

EXHIBIT(S)

New York Disclosure Statement

EXHIBIT(S)

List of Dependents

EXHIBIT(S)

FedEx confirmation

EXHIBIT(S)

New York Purchase Contract

EXHIBIT(S)

Payment Schedule

PETITION

--none--

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/28/2017; Received: 08/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 07/12/2017; Received: 07/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #001); Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Statement of Professional Representation; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A New York Disclosure Statement; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Prior; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E New York Disclosure Statement; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D List of Dependents; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C FedEx confirmation; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B New York Purchase Contract; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Payment Schedule; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Hamerman, D.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less