This case was last updated from Warren County Courts on 01/01/2021 at 05:58:35 (UTC).

Jessica Carbotti v. Town of Queensbury et al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2020 Jessica Carbotti filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Town of Queensbury. This case was filed in Warren County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8502

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Warren, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

T I INFANT

Jessica Carbotti PARENT/GUARDIAN as Parent and Natural Guardian of T.I., and Infant under the age of Fourteen

Defendants

Corey Tilley

QUEENSBURY TOWN OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IVERSEN, DAVID ISAAC

Attorney at E. Stewart Jones Hacker Murphy, LLP

Defendant Attorney

BAILEY, RYAN PATRICK

Attorney at Bailey, Johnson and Peck

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Certificate of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Certificate of Service; Filed By: Bailey, R.; Filed: 12/28/2020; Received: 12/28/2020

ANSWER Answer

ANSWER Answer; Filed By: Bailey, R.; Filed: 12/28/2020; Received: 12/28/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iversen, D.; Filed: 12/22/2020; Received: 12/22/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iversen, D.; Filed: 12/10/2020; Received: 12/10/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Claim with Affidavit of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Claim with Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Iversen, D.; Filed: 12/02/2020; Received: 12/02/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Iversen, D.; Filed: 12/02/2020; Received: 12/02/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Certificate of Service; Filed By: Bailey, R.; Filed: 12/28/2020; Received: 12/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer; Filed By: Bailey, R.; Filed: 12/28/2020; Received: 12/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iversen, D.; Filed: 12/22/2020; Received: 12/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Iversen, D.; Filed: 12/10/2020; Received: 12/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Claim with Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Iversen, D.; Filed: 12/02/2020; Received: 12/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Iversen, D.; Filed: 12/02/2020; Received: 12/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less