This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:01:06 (UTC).

Jerry Abernathy - v. - Joan Morrison

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 Jerry Abernathy filed an Other lawsuit against Joan Morrison. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jerry Abernathy

Defendant

Joan Morrison

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FORTNEY, REBECCA JEANNE

Attorney at FERRO, KUBA, MANGANO, SKLYAR, PC

Defendant Attorney

GUNSBURG, SHLOMO Z.

Attorney at JAMES G. BILELLO & ASSOCIATES; GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gunsburg, S. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Gunsburg, S. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 10/25/2017; Received: 10/25/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Fortney, R.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Gunsburg, S. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Fortney, R.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Gunsburg, S. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 10/25/2017; Received: 10/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gunsburg, S. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Gunsburg, S. - filed by James G. Bilello & Associates; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Fortney, R.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Fortney, R.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less