This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/28/2020 at 15:23:15 (UTC).

JEROME D ADAMS v. MARLEN BELTREZ

Case Summary

On 05/15/2019 JEROME D ADAMS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARLEN BELTREZ. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary Ann Brigantti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Mary Ann Brigantti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jerome D Adams

Defendant

Marlen Beltrez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

USTEN, VITALIY

Attorney at Usten Law PC

Defendant Attorney

DOMOTO, JEFFREY A

Attorney at Law Offices of Jennifer S. Adams

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED: JANUARY 21, 2020

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED: JANUARY 21, 2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Preliminary Conference Order

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Preliminary Conference Order; Filed By: Domoto, J.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 10/01/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 10/01/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Combined Demands & Responses Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Combined Demands & Responses Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Usten, V.; Filed: 10/02/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Plaintiffs Combined Demands, Combined Responses Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Plaintiffs Combined Demands, Combined Responses Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Usten, V.; Filed: 10/02/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

BILL OF PARTICULARS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

BILL OF PARTICULARS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Usten, V.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED: 07/30/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED: 07/30/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Domoto, J.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Domoto, J.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service of S&C on Def. Beltrez

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service of S&C on Def. Beltrez; Filed By: Usten, V.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Usten, V.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED: JANUARY 21, 2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Preliminary Conference Order; Filed By: Domoto, J.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 10/01/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/15/2019; Received: 10/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Combined Demands & Responses Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Usten, V.; Filed: 10/02/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND Plaintiffs Combined Demands, Combined Responses Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Usten, V.; Filed: 10/02/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Usten, V.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED: 07/30/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Domoto, J.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Domoto, J.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service of S&C on Def. Beltrez; Filed By: Usten, V.; Filed: 06/17/2019; Received: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Usten, V.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less