This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 08:25:11 (UTC).

Jenna McBratney - v. - The City of New York et al

Case Summary

On 06/19/2017 Jenna McBratney filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against The City of New York. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas P Aliotta. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Thomas P Aliotta

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jenna Mcbratney

Defendants

Westport Street Homeowners Association, Inc.

New York City Department of Transportation

Fire Department of the City of New York

Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc.

Westport Village Homeowners Association, Inc.

The City of New York

Not Yet Classified

Grace Mattei Non-Party Respondent

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROMAGNOLO, JOSEPH ANTHONY

Attorney at Law Offices of Joseph A Romagnolo Esq

Defendant Attorneys

ESON, WENDY

Attorney at PILLINGER MILLER TARALLO

FAMULARI, GIANNA M.

Attorney at New York City Law Department, Staten Island Tort Office

RICCIARDI, SUSAN CHRISTINE

BRODERICK, ANN

Attorney at OFFICE OF CORPORATION COUNSEL STATEN ISLAND TORTS

Counsel, Corporation

Attorney at New York City Corporation Counsel

MORIELLO, MICHAEL L.

Attorney at Con Edison

O'GORMAN, EDWARD J.

Attorney at PILLINGER MILLER TARALLO LLP

PILLINGER, MARC H

Attorney at PILLINGER MILLER TARALLO LLP

Not Yet Classified Attorney

MARANGOS, JOHN ZACHARY

Attorney at JOHN Z MARANGOS ESQ

 

Court Documents

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

DEMAND FOR:

DEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY J. MARANGOS, ESQ.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY J. MARANGOS, ESQ.; Filed By: Marangos, J.; Filed: 08/14/2019; Received: 08/14/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #004) Street Report

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #004) Street Report; Filed By: O'Gorman, E.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004) E-mail from Attorney representing Municipal Data Service

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004) E-mail from Attorney representing Municipal Data Service; Filed By: O'Gorman, E.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: O'Gorman, E.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #004) Affirmation in Opposition

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #004) Affirmation in Opposition; Filed By: O'Gorman, E.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #004)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #004); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)

SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI); Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION

STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION; Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

DEMAND FOR: City's Combined Demands to all parties and notice of deposition

DEMAND FOR: City's Combined Demands to all parties and notice of deposition; Filed By: Kelly, M.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

ANSWER City's Answer, Verification and Affidavit of Service

ANSWER City's Answer, Verification and Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Kelly, M.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

93 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY J. MARANGOS, ESQ.; Filed By: Marangos, J.; Filed: 08/14/2019; Received: 08/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #004) Street Report; Filed By: O'Gorman, E.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004) E-mail from Attorney representing Municipal Data Service; Filed By: O'Gorman, E.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: O'Gorman, E.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #004) Affirmation in Opposition; Filed By: O'Gorman, E.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #004); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #004) JUDICIAL SUBPOENA; Filed By: Marangos, J.; Filed: 07/18/2019; Received: 07/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI); Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION; Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 09/26/2017; Received: 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: City's Combined Demands to all parties and notice of deposition; Filed By: Kelly, M.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER City's Answer, Verification and Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Kelly, M.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Romagnolo, J.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less