This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:48:56 (UTC).

JEMMA FALTINE-CHRISTIAN et al - v. - JOYCE MATTHEWS

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 JEMMA FALTINE-CHRISTIAN filed an Other lawsuit against JOYCE MATTHEWS. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jemma Faltine-christian

Charles Christian

Defendant

Joyce Matthews

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEVILLE, JAMES DANIEL

Attorney at LIPSIG, SHAPEY, MANUS & MOVERMAN

Defendant Attorneys

FERRETTI, JOHN R

Attorney at NICOLINI PARADISE FERRETTI & SABELLA

ALTO, LAURA

Attorney at Devitt Spellman Barrett LLP

NICOLINI, JOHN J

Attorney at NICOLINI, PARADISE, FERRETTI & SABELLA

CAVANAGH, CATHERINE F.

Attorney at Nicolini Paradise Ferretti & Sabella

 

Court Documents

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Neville, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #2)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #2); Filed By: Neville, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 02/07/2019; Received: 02/07/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Neville, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Alto, L.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

ANSWER Answer & Demands

ANSWER Answer & Demands; Filed By: Ferretti, J.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Neville, J. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Alto, L.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Appeal

NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Appeal; Filed By: Alto, L.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Ferretti, J.; Filed: 01/02/2020; Received: 01/02/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Neville, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply Affirmation

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply Affirmation; Filed By: Cavanagh, C.; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Neville, J. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Neville, J. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cavanagh, C.; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Neville, J. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) dated 5/2/19

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) dated 5/2/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Neville, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 02/07/2019; Received: 02/07/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Neville, J. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Ferretti, J.; Filed: 01/02/2020; Received: 01/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) dated 5/2/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/06/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cavanagh, C.; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply Affirmation; Filed By: Cavanagh, C.; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #2); Filed By: Neville, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 02/07/2019; Received: 02/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Neville, J. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 02/07/2019; Received: 02/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Alto, L.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Appeal; Filed By: Alto, L.; Filed: 01/03/2019; Received: 01/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Alto, L.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) NOTE OF ISSUE ORDER /NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Alto, L.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated:10/16/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/18/2017; Received: 10/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Neville, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Neville, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Neville, J. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Neville, J. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer & Demands; Filed By: Ferretti, J.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Neville, J. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Neville, J. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/09/2017; Received: 06/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Neville, J. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Neville, J. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less