This case was last updated from Rockland County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 15:28:56 (UTC).

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC - v. - THERESA HENDRICK

Case Summary

On 05/02/2017 JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against THERESA HENDRICK. This case was filed in Rockland County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Rockland County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Rockland, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC

Defendant

Theresa Hendrick

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARBUS, MARK A

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

WATTS, VALERIE ELIZABETH

Attorney at RUBIN AND ROTHMAN, LLC

LEIDERMAN, JOEL D

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on September 12, 2018

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on September 12, 2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/12/2018; Received: 09/13/2018

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Leiderman, J.; Filed: 09/12/2018; Received: 09/12/2018

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT BY SHERIFF EXECUTION

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT BY SHERIFF EXECUTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/13/2018; Received: 08/13/2018

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/27/2017; Received: 11/27/2017

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on November 16, 2017

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on November 16, 2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

AFFIRMATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

AFFIRMATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

AFFIDAVIT OF PURCHASE AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT SELLER Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF PURCHASE AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT SELLER Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT DAFH659671 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT DAFH659671 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on September 12, 2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/12/2018; Received: 09/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Leiderman, J.; Filed: 09/12/2018; Received: 09/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT BY SHERIFF EXECUTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/13/2018; Received: 08/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/27/2017; Received: 11/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on November 16, 2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF PURCHASE AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT SELLER Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 11/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT DAFH659671 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less