Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 04/08/2020 at 02:19:08 (UTC).

JEAN C. MATHIEU - v. - LSG 105 WEST 28TH LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/03/2017 JEAN C MATHIEU filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LSG 105 WEST 28TH LLC. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jean C. Mathieu

Defendants and Petitioners

LSG 105 WEST 28TH LLC

FLINTLOCK CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, LLC

H.A.E. AIR, INC.

Respondent

D&D ELECTRICAL CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HURWITZ, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at Block OToole Murphy LLP

Petitioner Attorney

KIERSTEN MARIE SCHRAMEK JESSICA MONTELLO

Defendant Attorneys

MONTELLO, JESSICA

Attorney at Bartlett LLP

SCHRAMEK, KIERSTEN MARIE

Attorney at Law Office of William G. Sayegh, PC

MORRIS, PETER JOHN

Attorney at SARACINO MORRIS LAW GROUP PLLC

 

Court Documents

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

--none--

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

Stipulation to Adjourn Motion

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AOS

EXHIBIT(S)

EXHIBIT 16 - SUBCONTRACT (FLINTLOCK -D&D)

EXHIBIT(S)

EXHIBIT 15 - SUBCONTRACT (FLINTLOCK -H.A.E)

EXHIBIT(S)

EXHIBIT 14 - CONSTRUCTION CONTRACT

EXHIBIT(S)

EXHIBIT 13 - DRAWINGS

EXHIBIT(S)

EXHIBIT 12 - SAFETY PROGRAM

AFFIDAVIT

AOS Secretary of State - H.A.E. AIR INC.

AFFIDAVIT

Notice of Electronic Filing

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER

Stipulation Extending Time To Answer

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

81 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Hurwitz, M.; Filed: 04/03/2020; Received: 04/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) (Motion #002) Stipulation to Adjourn Motion; Filed By: Montello, J.; Filed: 03/25/2020; Received: 03/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketURGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) AOS; Filed By: Hurwitz, M.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 16 (Motion #002) EXHIBIT 16 - SUBCONTRACT (FLINTLOCK -D&D); Filed By: Hurwitz, M.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 15 (Motion #002) EXHIBIT 15 - SUBCONTRACT (FLINTLOCK -H.A.E); Filed By: Hurwitz, M.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 14 (Motion #002) EXHIBIT 14 - CONSTRUCTION CONTRACT; Filed By: Hurwitz, M.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 13 (Motion #002) EXHIBIT 13 - DRAWINGS; Filed By: Hurwitz, M.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 12 (Motion #002) EXHIBIT 12 - SAFETY PROGRAM; Filed By: Hurwitz, M.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 11 (Motion #002) EXHIBIT 11 - NOTE OF ISSUE; Filed By: Hurwitz, M.; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Defendants Answer and Discovery Demands; Filed By: King, T.; Filed: 11/15/2017; Received: 11/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AOS Secretary of State - H.A.E. AIR INC.; Filed By: Hurwitz, M.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Notice of Electronic Filing; Filed By: Hurwitz, M.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Hurwitz, M.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Hurwitz, M.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Hurwitz, M.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Hurwitz, M.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Hurwitz, M.; Filed: 11/14/2017; Received: 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time To Answer; Filed By: King, T.; Filed: 10/25/2017; Received: 10/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Hurwitz, M.; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less