Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/25/2020 at 03:18:53 (UTC).

JDM Washington Street LLC v. 90 Washington Street LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 JDM Washington Street LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against 90 Washington Street LLC. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is David B Cohen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

David B Cohen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JDM Washington Street LLC

Defendants

90 Washington Street LLC

GWK Washington Street LLC

Battery Associates LLC

EKatz Family, LLC

WSK Washington Street LLC

MJK Washington Street LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

D'AMICO, EVAN EUGENE

Attorney at Rosenberg & Estis, P.C.

FEINSTEIN, MICHAEL E

Attorney at ROSENBERG & ESTIS, P.C.

BROWN, ELIZABETH MARGARET

Attorney at ROSENBERG & ESTIS, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

Shyman, Jamie Brooke

Attorney at AKERMAN LLP

BERNSTEIN, JOSHUA D

Attorney at Akerman LLP

KESSLER, SCOTT M

Attorney at Akerman LLP

MAZUMDAR, RUMA B

Attorney at Akerman LLP

PRYSTOWSKY, KATHLEEN MARIE

Attorney at Akerman LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL (Motion #001); Filed By: Mazumdar, R.; Filed: 03/20/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/20/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

NOTICE OF APPEAL Notice of Appeal Informational Statement Form and Decision

NOTICE OF APPEAL Notice of Appeal Informational Statement Form and Decision; Filed By: Feinstein, M.; Filed: 03/20/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED (Motion #001) February 19, 2020 Proceedings

TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED (Motion #001) February 19, 2020 Proceedings; Filed By: Mazumdar, R.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS (Motion #001) February 5, 2020 Proceedings

TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS (Motion #001) February 5, 2020 Proceedings; Filed By: Mazumdar, R.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

BOND/UNDERTAKING Notice of Filing of Bond/Undertaking (Motion Seq. 001)

BOND/UNDERTAKING Notice of Filing of Bond/Undertaking (Motion Seq. 001); Filed By: Feinstein, M.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry; Filed By: Bernstein, J.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry; Filed By: D'Amico, E.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) 18 prior agreements extending the expiration of the cure period

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) 18 prior agreements extending the expiration of the cure period; Filed By: Feinstein, M.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Agreement extending the expiration of the cure period

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Agreement extending the expiration of the cure period; Filed By: Feinstein, M.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Lease

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Lease; Filed By: Feinstein, M.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Feinstein, M.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Thirty (30) Day Notice to Cure

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Thirty (30) Day Notice to Cure; Filed By: Feinstein, M.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) John Mehmedovic Affidavit in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Yellowstone Injunction

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) John Mehmedovic Affidavit in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Yellowstone Injunction; Filed By: Feinstein, M.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Michael E. Feinstein Emergency Affirmation

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Michael E. Feinstein Emergency Affirmation; Filed By: Feinstein, M.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraining Order

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraining Order; Filed By: Feinstein, M.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint; Filed By: D'Amico, E.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL (Motion #001); Filed By: Mazumdar, R.; Filed: 03/20/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketURGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/20/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL Notice of Appeal Informational Statement Form and Decision; Filed By: Feinstein, M.; Filed: 03/20/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED (Motion #001) February 19, 2020 Proceedings; Filed By: Mazumdar, R.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS (Motion #001) February 5, 2020 Proceedings; Filed By: Mazumdar, R.; Filed: 03/16/2020; Received: 03/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND/UNDERTAKING Notice of Filing of Bond/Undertaking (Motion Seq. 001); Filed By: Feinstein, M.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry; Filed By: Bernstein, J.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry; Filed By: D'Amico, E.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) DOB printout reflecting the disposition of the three violations; Filed By: Feinstein, M.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) 18 prior agreements extending the expiration of the cure period; Filed By: Feinstein, M.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Agreement extending the expiration of the cure period; Filed By: Feinstein, M.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Lease; Filed By: Feinstein, M.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Feinstein, M.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Thirty (30) Day Notice to Cure; Filed By: Feinstein, M.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) John Mehmedovic Affidavit in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Yellowstone Injunction; Filed By: Feinstein, M.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Michael E. Feinstein Emergency Affirmation; Filed By: Feinstein, M.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraining Order; Filed By: Feinstein, M.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint; Filed By: D'Amico, E.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less