This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 20:56:56 (UTC).

Jasmine T Scott - v. - Benjamin L Kestel

Case Summary

On 07/21/2017 Jasmine T Scott filed an Other lawsuit against Benjamin L Kestel. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jasmine T Scott

Defendant

Benjamin L Kestel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CERCONE, ROLAND M.

Attorney at Law Office of Roland M. Cercone, PLLC

Defendant Attorney

PALMERTON, NICOLE B.

Attorney at Law Offices of Jennifer S. Adams

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

--none--

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

--none--

ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM

--none--

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

Order

AFFIRMATION

Reply Affirmation

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Photograph

EXHIBIT(S)

Defendant Deposition

NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

good faith letter

EXHIBIT(S)

discovery demands

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

--none--

NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

ADMISSION OF SERVICE

--none--

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

ANSWER

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Palmerton, N.; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Cercone, R.; Filed: 04/15/2019; Received: 04/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #003); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/05/2019; Received: 03/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) Order; Filed By: Cercone, R.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Reply Affirmation; Filed By: Cercone, R.; Filed: 01/15/2019; Received: 01/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003); Filed By: Palmerton, N.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #003); Filed By: Palmerton, N.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Photograph; Filed By: Cercone, R.; Filed: 12/03/2018; Received: 12/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Defendant Deposition; Filed By: Cercone, R.; Filed: 12/03/2018; Received: 12/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Plaintiff Deposition; Filed By: Cercone, R.; Filed: 12/03/2018; Received: 12/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Palmerton, N.; Filed: 03/23/2018; Received: 03/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Palmerton, N.; Filed: 03/23/2018; Received: 03/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) good faith letter; Filed By: Palmerton, N.; Filed: 10/12/2017; Received: 10/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) discovery demands; Filed By: Palmerton, N.; Filed: 10/12/2017; Received: 10/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Palmerton, N.; Filed: 10/12/2017; Received: 10/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Palmerton, N.; Filed: 10/12/2017; Received: 10/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMISSION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cercone, R.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Palmerton, N.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Palmerton, N.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Cercone, R.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less