This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 06/24/2020 at 16:36:45 (UTC).

JANUSZ J LORENZ et al v. ZOFIA WEGLINSKI et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2019 JANUSZ J LORENZ filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ZOFIA WEGLINSKI. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is David B. Vaughan, Comm 9. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

David B. Vaughan, Comm 9

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Janusz J Lorenz

Tomasz J Lorenz

Defendants

Zofia Weglinski

Jolanta Bank

Bogdana Bidzinski

Not Yet Classified

Jolanta Bak

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAGDA, ROMUALD PIOTR

Attorney at ROMUALD P. MAGDA LAW OFFICE

Defendant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

REITER, DANIEL JEREMY

Attorney at DANIEL J. REITER, ESQ.

MARZEC, DARIUS A

Attorney at MARZEC LAW FIRM, PC

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

--none--

AFFIRMATION

--none--

STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

--none--

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Reiter, D.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Marzec, D.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A to Amended Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A to Amended Answer; Filed By: Marzec, D.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Magda, R.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Marzec, D.; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Marzec, D.; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Reiter, D.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Schedule of Loan

EXHIBIT(S) - C Schedule of Loan; Filed By: Magda, R.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Note and Mortgage

EXHIBIT(S) - B Note and Mortgage; Filed By: Magda, R.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A lilst of defendants

EXHIBIT(S) - A lilst of defendants; Filed By: Magda, R.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

COMPLAINT verified complaint

COMPLAINT verified complaint; Filed By: Magda, R.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

SUMMONS summons and notice

SUMMONS summons and notice; Filed By: Magda, R.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Reiter, D.; Filed: 05/18/2020; Received: 05/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Reiter, D.; Filed: 05/18/2020; Received: 05/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Reiter, D.; Filed: 05/18/2020; Received: 05/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Marzec, D.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Marzec, D.; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Reiter, D.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Marzec, D.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A to Amended Answer; Filed By: Marzec, D.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER (AMENDED); Filed By: Marzec, D.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Marzec, D.; Filed: 04/23/2019; Received: 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Magda, R.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Marzec, D.; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Marzec, D.; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Reiter, D.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Schedule of Loan; Filed By: Magda, R.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Note and Mortgage; Filed By: Magda, R.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A lilst of defendants; Filed By: Magda, R.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT verified complaint; Filed By: Magda, R.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS summons and notice; Filed By: Magda, R.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less