This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 12:28:42 (UTC).

Janice B. Brock v. Mary McDermott

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 Janice B Brock filed an Other lawsuit against Mary McDermott. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Julia Rodriguez. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Julia Rodriguez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Janice B. Brock Petitioner, Pursuant to Article 12 of the CPLR for the Appointment as Guardian Ad Litem of

Defendant

Mary Mcdermott An Alleged Incapacitated Person

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CTORIDES, CHRISTINA

Attorney at JAVERBAUM WURGAFT HICKS KAHN WIKSTROM & SININS, P.C.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE Status Conference 9/26/19

NOTICE Status Conference 9/26/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/04/2019; Received: 09/04/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER & SIGNED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DATED 04/26/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER & SIGNED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DATED 04/26/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ctorides, C.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ctorides, C.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Ctorides, C.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

ORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Ctorides, C.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #001)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #001); Filed By: Ctorides, C.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

PETITION Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

PETITION Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ctorides, C.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE Status Conference 9/26/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/04/2019; Received: 09/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER & SIGNED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DATED 04/26/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ctorides, C.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ctorides, C.; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Ctorides, C.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Ctorides, C.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #001); Filed By: Ctorides, C.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ctorides, C.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less