This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:09:36 (UTC).

Jamison Sarteschi - v. - City of New York

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 Jamison Sarteschi filed an Other lawsuit against City of New York. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jamison Sarteschi

Defendant

City of New York

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORICI, ROBERT

Attorney at Morici & Morici, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

Counsel, Corporation

Attorney at New York City Corporation Counsel

MEYER, ERICA MICHELE

Attorney at New York City Law Department

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Morici, R.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/24/2018; Received: 04/25/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Notice of Claim

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Notice of Claim; Filed By: Meyer, E.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Meyer, E.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Morici, R.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Morici, R.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) City Transcript

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) City Transcript; Filed By: Meyer, E.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #1) dtd 7/3/19

ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #1) dtd 7/3/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/05/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Morici, R.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 10/16/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 10/16/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 11/20/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Meyer, E.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Morici, R.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Morici, R.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Morici, R.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Morici, R.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

ORDER - OTHER CONFERENCE DTD 09/03/2019

ORDER - OTHER CONFERENCE DTD 09/03/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Morici, R.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Morici, R.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER CONFERENCE DTD 09/03/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #1) dtd 7/3/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/05/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Morici, R.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Morici, R.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) City Transcript; Filed By: Meyer, E.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Meyer, E.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Notice of Claim; Filed By: Meyer, E.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Meyer, E.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Morici, R.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #1) Photo of Catch Basin; Filed By: Morici, R.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/23/2018; Received: 11/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/24/2018; Received: 04/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 10/16/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 11/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Morici, R.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Morici, R.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Morici, R.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Morici, R.; Filed: 07/26/2017; Received: 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Morici, R.; Filed: 06/30/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Morici, R.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Morici, R.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less