This case was last updated from Jefferson County New York Courts on 03/20/2023 at 17:11:22 (UTC).

JAMES O'DONNELL et al v. TOWN BOARD OF THE TOWN OF CLAYTON, NY et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 JAMES O'DONNELL filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against TOWN BOARD OF THE TOWN OF CLAYTON, NY. This case was filed in Jefferson County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Jefferson, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is William Ramseier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********1996

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, New York

Judge Details

Judge

William Ramseier

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

James O'donnell Individually and as Managing Member of VFTT, LLC

William Cosgrove Individually and as Trustee of the William Cosgrove Trust

Mary carol Mark

Eric Mower Individually and as Managing Member of Seaspray Reduc, LLC

Wiliam J Bonisteel

Maria M Bonisteel

Defendants

TOWN BOARD OF THE TOWN OF CLAYTON, NY

TOWN OF CLAYTON, JEFFERSON COUNTY, NY

Kimberli Johnston ASSESSOR OF TOWN OF CLAYTON

Not Yet Classified

Thousand Islands Central School

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURROWS, JAMES A.

Defendant Attorney

VINCELETTE, DANIEL GERARD

Not Yet Classified Attorney

JERAM, WALTER MCEWAN

 

Court Documents

PETITION Verified Petition

PETITION Verified Petition; Filed By: Burrows, J.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #1) Notice of Petition

NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #1) Notice of Petition; Filed By: Burrows, J.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Burrows, J.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service (3)

PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service (3); Filed By: Burrows, J.; Filed: 08/05/2022; Received: 08/05/2022

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Jeram, W.; Filed: 09/15/2022; Received: 09/15/2022

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1)

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/16/2022; Received: 09/16/2022

 

Docket Entries

09/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/16/2022; Received: 09/16/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Jeram, W.; Filed: 09/15/2022; Received: 09/15/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service (3); Filed By: Burrows, J.; Filed: 08/05/2022; Received: 08/05/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Burrows, J.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #1) Notice of Petition; Filed By: Burrows, J.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPETITION Verified Petition; Filed By: Burrows, J.; Filed: 07/27/2022; Received: 07/27/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less