This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 12:22:29 (UTC).

JAMES MURRAY et al v. PATRICE TIFFANY CALDWELL et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 JAMES MURRAY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PATRICE TIFFANY CALDWELL. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary Ann Brigantti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Mary Ann Brigantti

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

James Murray

Andrena Cobb

Defendants

Patrice Tiffany Caldwell

Grace Yolanta Kozak

EMPIRE PARATRANSIT CORP.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KHAVINSON, EUGENE A.

Attorney at Khavinson and Associates PC

Defendant Attorneys

GONZALEZ, RICHARD

Attorney at GALLO VITUCCI KLAR LLP

SWEENEY, ROBERT P.

Attorney at DeSena & Sweeney, LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 10/8/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 10/8/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 9/10/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 9/10/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Court - Withdrawal of Motion to Compel

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Court - Withdrawal of Motion to Compel; Filed By: Gonzalez, R.; Filed: 08/30/2019; Received: 08/30/2019

NOTICE TO ADMIT

NOTICE TO ADMIT; Filed By: Khavinson, E.; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) BP and Responses to Demands

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) BP and Responses to Demands; Filed By: Khavinson, E.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) PC Order

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) PC Order; Filed By: Khavinson, E.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Khavinson, E.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED AUGUST 6,2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED AUGUST 6,2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Gonzalez, R.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001) GOOD-FAITH AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001) GOOD-FAITH AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Gonzalez, R.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Gonzalez, R.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) NOTICE OF MOTION TO PRECLUDE

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) NOTICE OF MOTION TO PRECLUDE; Filed By: Gonzalez, R.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

ANSWER ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT

ANSWER ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gonzalez, R.; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Khavinson, E.; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/07/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Sweeney, R.; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Khavinson, E.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Khavinson, E.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Khavinson, E.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 10/8/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 9/10/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Court - Withdrawal of Motion to Compel; Filed By: Gonzalez, R.; Filed: 08/30/2019; Received: 08/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO ADMIT; Filed By: Khavinson, E.; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) BP and Responses to Demands; Filed By: Khavinson, E.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) PC Order; Filed By: Khavinson, E.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Khavinson, E.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED AUGUST 6,2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Gonzalez, R.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gonzalez, R.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint - 22 MAR 19; Filed By: Gonzalez, R.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #001) GOOD-FAITH AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Gonzalez, R.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Gonzalez, R.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) NOTICE OF MOTION TO PRECLUDE; Filed By: Gonzalez, R.; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gonzalez, R.; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Khavinson, E.; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Sweeney, R.; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Khavinson, E.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Khavinson, E.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Khavinson, E.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less