This case was last updated from Monroe County Courts on 08/13/2020 at 16:25:39 (UTC).

JAMES MANCHESTER v. 3M COMPANY, et al

Case Summary

On 12/30/2019 JAMES MANCHESTER filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 3M COMPANY. This case was filed in Monroe County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is John J Ark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2155

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Monroe, New York

Judge Details

Judge

John J Ark

 

Party Details

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER, LLC

ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC. a/k/a and Successor-in-Interest to Erie City Iron Works

GARDNER DENVER, INC.

ALRAY CONSTRUCTION CORP., Individually and as Successor to R.E. Hebert and Company, Inc.

EATON CORPORATION, Individually and now known as Eaton Electrical, Inc. and As Successor to The Vickers Pump Company and Cutler-Hammer, Inc. and Waterbury Pump

R.E. HEBERT AND COMPANY, INC.

NIAGARA INSULATIONS, INC. f/k/a Niagara Asbestos Co., Inc.

GOULD ELECTRONICS, INC., Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to I-T-E Imperial Corporation and I-T-E Circuit Breaker Company

MADER PLASTERING CORP.

COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC., Individually and as Successor to Crouse-Hinds Hospital

CRANE CO.

FMC CORPORATION, Individually and as Successor to Northern Pump Company, Coffin and Peerless Pump Company

FLOWSERVE US, INC., solely as Successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company, Edward Valves, Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc. and Edward Vogt Valve Company

BW/IP INTERNATIONAL CO., formerly known as Borg Warner Industrial Products Inc., a former subsidiary of and successor to Borg Warner Corp. and Byron Jackson Pumps

WILLIAM SUMMERHAYS' SONS CORPORATION

DAVIS-FETCH & CO., INC.

PROGRESS LIGHTING, INC.

ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY, INC., Individually and as Successor to Rostone

SIEMENS INDUSTRY, INC.

LIGHTOLIER INCORPORATED

52 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

DEAN, MEAGAN ELIZABETH

Attorney at McGivney, Kluger, Clark & Intoccia, P.C.

MCKEOWN, MICHAEL

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney, Ltd.

VAN GELDER, SUSAN ELIZABETH

Attorney at GOLDBERG SEGALLA LLP

YAVITZ, JUDITH A

Attorney at Darger Errante Yavitz & Blau LLP

SORENSEN, BRIAN JONATHAN

Attorney at MCELROY DEUTSCH MULVANEY & CARPENTER, LLP

GREENBLATT, JAIME LAUREN

Attorney at Harris Beach PLLC

RYAN, JODIE L.

Attorney at McElroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP

Other Attorneys

BELLUCK, JOSEPH WARREN

Attorney at BELLUCK & FOX, LLP

DYMOND, SETH A

Attorney at BELLUCK & FOX, LLP

MUELLER, WILLIAM F

Attorney at CLEMENTE MUELLER, P.A.

HOLLMAN, LAURA B.

Attorney at ECKERT SEAMANS

BLADEL, CHRISTOPHER BRIAN

Attorney at Eckert, Seamans, Cherin & Mellott, LLC

GRADY, MICHELLE DENISE

Attorney at Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC

GREENE, NORMAN E.

Attorney at BOUVIER LAW LLP

HUTTNER, BRUCE S.

Attorney at DONOHUE, SABO, VARLEY & HUTTNER LLP

O'ROURKE, PHILIP J

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

DAVIE, STEPHEN S.

Attorney at MACKENZIE HUGHES LLP

MASINO, MICHAEL J

Attorney at HARRIS BEACH PLLC

HULL, RONALD GEORGE

Attorney at Heisman Nunes & Hull LLP

SCHAFFER, DAVID P

Attorney at MALABY & BRADLEY LLC

34 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to The Honorable Richard T. Aulisi with Proposed Order of Dismissal as to Defendant Hubbell Incorporated (Delaware)

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to The Honorable Richard T. Aulisi with Proposed Order of Dismissal as to Defendant Hubbell Incorporated (Delaware); Filed By: Greenblatt, J.; Filed: 08/13/2020; Received: 08/13/2020

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to The Honorable Richard T. Aulisi with Proposed Order of Dismissal as to Defendant Progress Lighting, Inc.

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to The Honorable Richard T. Aulisi with Proposed Order of Dismissal as to Defendant Progress Lighting, Inc.; Filed By: Greenblatt, J.; Filed: 08/13/2020; Received: 08/13/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Order of Dismissal on behalf of Bird Incorporated f/k/a Bird & Son Inc.

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Order of Dismissal on behalf of Bird Incorporated f/k/a Bird & Son Inc.; Filed By: Carroll, A.; Filed: 08/10/2020; Received: 08/10/2020

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Fox, N.; Filed: 08/07/2020; Received: 08/07/2020

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice as to Defendant Progress Lighting, Inc. Only

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice as to Defendant Progress Lighting, Inc. Only; Filed By: Greenblatt, J.; Filed: 08/07/2020; Received: 08/07/2020

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice as to Defendant Hubbell Inc. (DE) Only

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice as to Defendant Hubbell Inc. (DE) Only; Filed By: Greenblatt, J.; Filed: 08/07/2020; Received: 08/07/2020

AFFIDAVIT AOS Siemens

AFFIDAVIT AOS Siemens; Filed By: Burgasser, J.; Filed: 08/07/2020; Received: 08/07/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY NOE Siemens

NOTICE OF ENTRY NOE Siemens; Filed By: Burgasser, J.; Filed: 08/07/2020; Received: 08/07/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Buffalo Pumps

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Buffalo Pumps; Filed By: Burgasser, J.; Filed: 08/07/2020; Received: 08/07/2020

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) Order To Show Cause; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1); Filed By: Dymond, S. - filed by Belluck & Fox, LLP; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Dymond, S. - filed by Belluck & Fox, LLP; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Medical Affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Medical Affidavit; Filed By: Dymond, S. - filed by Belluck & Fox, LLP; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons & Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Dymond, S. - filed by Belluck & Fox, LLP; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Dymond, S. - filed by Belluck & Fox, LLP; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Belluck, J. - filed by Belluck & Fox; Filed: 12/30/2019; Received: 12/30/2019

PLAINTIFFS INITIAL FACT SHEET

PLAINTIFFS INITIAL FACT SHEET; Filed By: Belluck, J. - filed by Belluck & Fox; Filed: 12/30/2019; Received: 12/30/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Belluck, J. - filed by Belluck & Fox; Filed: 12/30/2019; Received: 12/30/2019

153 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to The Honorable Richard T. Aulisi with Proposed Order of Dismissal as to Defendant Hubbell Incorporated (Delaware); Filed By: Greenblatt, J.; Filed: 08/13/2020; Received: 08/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to The Honorable Richard T. Aulisi with Proposed Order of Dismissal as to Defendant Progress Lighting, Inc.; Filed By: Greenblatt, J.; Filed: 08/13/2020; Received: 08/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Order of Dismissal on behalf of Bird Incorporated f/k/a Bird & Son Inc.; Filed By: Carroll, A.; Filed: 08/10/2020; Received: 08/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Fox, N.; Filed: 08/07/2020; Received: 08/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice as to Defendant Progress Lighting, Inc. Only; Filed By: Greenblatt, J.; Filed: 08/07/2020; Received: 08/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice as to Defendant Hubbell Inc. (DE) Only; Filed By: Greenblatt, J.; Filed: 08/07/2020; Received: 08/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AOS Siemens; Filed By: Burgasser, J.; Filed: 08/07/2020; Received: 08/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY NOE Siemens; Filed By: Burgasser, J.; Filed: 08/07/2020; Received: 08/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Buffalo Pumps; Filed By: Burgasser, J.; Filed: 08/07/2020; Received: 08/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry- Buffalo Pumps; Filed By: Burgasser, J.; Filed: 08/07/2020; Received: 08/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
145 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer to Complaint; Filed By: Mueller, W.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) Order To Show Cause; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1); Filed By: Dymond, S. - filed by Belluck & Fox, LLP; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Dymond, S. - filed by Belluck & Fox, LLP; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Medical Affidavit; Filed By: Dymond, S. - filed by Belluck & Fox, LLP; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Dymond, S. - filed by Belluck & Fox, LLP; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Dymond, S. - filed by Belluck & Fox, LLP; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Belluck, J. - filed by Belluck & Fox; Filed: 12/30/2019; Received: 12/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS INITIAL FACT SHEET; Filed By: Belluck, J. - filed by Belluck & Fox; Filed: 12/30/2019; Received: 12/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Belluck, J. - filed by Belluck & Fox; Filed: 12/30/2019; Received: 12/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less