This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 12:44:13 (UTC).

JAMES E BOWES v. KENNETH S HILDEBRANDT

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 JAMES E BOWES filed an Other lawsuit against KENNETH S HILDEBRANDT. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James E Bowes

Defendant

Kenneth S Hildebrandt

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANSONE, JOHN SAMUEL

Attorney at JOHN S. SANSONE, ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

BALKIN, PATRICK MICHAEL

Attorney at Jackson & Balkin

 

Court Documents

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Balkin, P.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING signed

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING signed; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/21/2019; Received: 10/21/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Sansone, J.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sansone, J.; Filed: 07/15/2019; Received: 07/15/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B List of Property

EXHIBIT(S) - B List of Property; Filed By: Sansone, J.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Deed

EXHIBIT(S) - A Deed; Filed By: Sansone, J.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sansone, J.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Sansone, J.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Balkin, P.; Filed: 01/23/2020; Received: 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE SCHEDULING signed; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/21/2019; Received: 10/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Sansone, J.; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sansone, J.; Filed: 07/15/2019; Received: 07/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B List of Property; Filed By: Sansone, J.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Deed; Filed By: Sansone, J.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Sansone, J.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Sansone, J.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less