This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 05:12:24 (UTC).

James A. Gardner - v. - Whitney Allyson Zammit et al

Case Summary

On 05/23/2017 James A Gardner filed an Other lawsuit against Whitney Allyson Zammit. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Diane Devlin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Diane Devlin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James A. Gardner

Defendants

Kate Righter gardner

Whitney Allyson Zammit as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kate Righter Gardner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DAVIS, MARK C

Attorney at Lippes Mathias Wexler Friedman LLP

RENDA, JAMES PHILIP

GARDNER, JAMES ANDREW

Attorney at James A. Gardner

Defendant Attorneys

VOELKL, JEFFREY FRANCIS

Attorney at ROBSHAW & VOELKL, P.C.

KILBRIDGE, BARBARA A.

Attorney at BARBARA A. KILBRIDGE

 

Court Documents

TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED

--none--

TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Transcript November 8, 2019

EXHIBIT(S)

Tax statement

EXHIBIT(S)

Inventory

EXHIBIT(S)

Colorado Deed

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

Reply Affirmation b Plaintiff

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Aff of Service .(Notice of Appeal CA19-00462)

EXHIBIT(S)

email

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Florida Court Order

EXHIBIT(S)

Objection to Claim

EXHIBIT(S)

Statement of Claim

EXHIBIT(S)

Judgment of Divorce

EXHIBIT(S)

Security Agreement

EXHIBIT(S)

Separation and Property Settlement Agreement

COMPLAINT

--none--

SUMMONS

--none--

165 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED (Motion #007); Filed By: Renda, J.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED; Filed By: Kilbridge, B.; Filed: 09/27/2019; Received: 09/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #008) Transcript November 8, 2019; Filed By: Renda, J.; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #008) Tax statement; Filed By: Renda, J.; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #008) Inventory; Filed By: Renda, J.; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #008) Colorado Deed; Filed By: Renda, J.; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #008) Reply Affirmation b Plaintiff; Filed By: Renda, J.; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service .(Notice of Appeal CA19-00462); Filed By: Renda, J.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #009) email; Filed By: Voelkl, J.; Filed: 09/04/2019; Received: 09/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #009) Notice to Admit; Filed By: Voelkl, J.; Filed: 09/04/2019; Received: 09/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
158 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Davis, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Davis, M.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Florida Court Order; Filed By: Davis, M.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Objection to Claim; Filed By: Davis, M.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Statement of Claim; Filed By: Davis, M.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Judgment of Divorce; Filed By: Davis, M.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Security Agreement; Filed By: Davis, M.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Separation and Property Settlement Agreement; Filed By: Davis, M.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Davis, M.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Davis, M.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less