This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 13:36:06 (UTC).

Jalala Ramadhan - v. - Gymnastic Society of Polish Falcons

Case Summary

On 06/08/2017 Jalala Ramadhan filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Gymnastic Society of Polish Falcons. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jalala Ramadhan

Defendant

Gymnastic Society of Polish Falcons

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAZZU, EDWARD THOMAS

Attorney at DOLCE PANEPINTO PC

Defendant Attorney

HARBOLD, TAMARA M.

Attorney at McCabe, Collins, McGeough, Fowler, Levine & Nogan

 

Court Documents

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (N.O.I. PREVIOUSLY PAID)

Jury Demand

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY

Note of Issue without jury

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING

THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING

SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING

AMENDED TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING

TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING

SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING

AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING

SCHEDULING ORDER

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOA

ANSWER

Defendant Answer

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

Summons and Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (N.O.I. PREVIOUSLY PAID) Jury Demand; Filed By: Harbold, T.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY Note of Issue without jury; Filed By: Mazzu, E.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE SCHEDULING THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE SCHEDULING SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/11/2019; Received: 07/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE SCHEDULING AMENDED TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE SCHEDULING TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/30/2018; Received: 10/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE SCHEDULING SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/31/2018; Received: 07/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE SCHEDULING AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/09/2018; Received: 03/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE SCHEDULING SCHEDULING ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/28/2017; Received: 11/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Mazzu, E.; Filed: 10/02/2017; Received: 10/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) NOA; Filed By: Harbold, T.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Defendant Answer; Filed By: Harbold, T.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Mazzu, E.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Mazzu, E.; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less