This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 23:17:21 (UTC).

JACLYN F. SILVER - v. - CASSANDRA VICTOR

Case Summary

On 06/21/2017 JACLYN F SILVER filed an Other lawsuit against CASSANDRA VICTOR. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jaclyn F. Silver

Defendant

Cassandra Victor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NICOTRA, RICHARD ANGELO

Attorney at Andrews, Bernstein, Maranto & Nicotra, PLLC

ANDRUSCHAT, TIMOTHY JAMES

Attorney at Andruschat Law Firm

Defendant Attorney

DOLAN, ERIC MICHAEL

Attorney at TREVETT CRISTO

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Nicotra, R.; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Entry and Order

EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Entry and Order; Filed By: Nicotra, R.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

NOTICE OF APPEAL (AMENDED)

NOTICE OF APPEAL (AMENDED); Filed By: Nicotra, R.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Nicotra, R.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Entry and Order

EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Entry and Order; Filed By: Nicotra, R.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

NOTICE OF APPEAL

NOTICE OF APPEAL; Filed By: Nicotra, R.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Dolan, E.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

--none--

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

--none--

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (N.O.I. PREVIOUSLY PAID)

--none--

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY

--none--

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION

--none--

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

--none--

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Nicotra, R.; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Entry and Order; Filed By: Nicotra, R.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL (AMENDED); Filed By: Nicotra, R.; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Nicotra, R.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Entry and Order; Filed By: Nicotra, R.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL; Filed By: Nicotra, R.; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Dolan, E.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/31/2019; Received: 12/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: Nicotra, R.; Filed: 05/17/2019; Received: 05/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #001); Filed By: Dolan, E.; Filed: 05/09/2019; Received: 05/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Andruschat, T.; Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Dolan, E.; Filed: 09/13/2018; Received: 09/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (N.O.I. PREVIOUSLY PAID); Filed By: Dolan, E.; Filed: 09/13/2018; Received: 09/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY; Filed By: Andruschat, T.; Filed: 09/05/2018; Received: 09/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Andruschat, T.; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Andruschat, T.; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Andruschat, T.; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION; Filed By: Andruschat, T.; Filed: 08/17/2017; Received: 08/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Andruschat, T.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Andruschat, T.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less