Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 18:46:38 (UTC).

Jack Collett et al - v. - Town of Guilderland et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 Jack Collett filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Town of Guilderland. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4-17

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Albany County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jack Collett

Susan Collett

Defendants

Town of Guilderland

Assessor of the Town of Guilderland

Board of Assessment Review

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BROWNE, ERIKA C

Attorney at GOLDMAN ATTORNEYS PLLC

GOLDMAN, PAUL J

Attorney at Goldman Attorneys PLLC

 

Court Documents

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #2)

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1)

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2) Decision/Order/Judgment

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2) Decision/Order/Judgment; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) Decision/Order/Judgment

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) Decision/Order/Judgment; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Browne, E.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #2) Notice of Petition and Petition for 2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #2) Notice of Petition and Petition for 2019; Filed By: Browne, E.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #2) Notice of Petition and Petition for 2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #2) Notice of Petition and Petition for 2018; Filed By: Browne, E.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #2) Notice of Petition and Petition for 2017

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #2) Notice of Petition and Petition for 2017; Filed By: Browne, E.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #2) RP 5217 Form, dated October 16, 2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #2) RP 5217 Form, dated October 16, 2019; Filed By: Browne, E.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service on the County Finance Director and the School District

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service on the County Finance Director and the School District; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service upon the Agent for the Assessor

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service upon the Agent for the Assessor; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service on the County Finance Director and the School District

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service on the County Finance Director and the School District; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service upon the Agent for the Assessor

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service upon the Agent for the Assessor; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Determination

EXHIBIT(S) - B Determination; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A Complaint; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1); Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #2); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2) Decision/Order/Judgment; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) Decision/Order/Judgment; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/06/2020; Received: 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Browne, E.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #2) Notice of Petition and Petition for 2019; Filed By: Browne, E.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #2) Notice of Petition and Petition for 2018; Filed By: Browne, E.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #2) Notice of Petition and Petition for 2017; Filed By: Browne, E.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #2) RP 5217 Form, dated October 16, 2019; Filed By: Browne, E.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #2) TP 584 Form, dated October 16, 2019; Filed By: Browne, E.; Filed: 01/13/2020; Received: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/19/2018; Received: 06/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service on the County Finance Director and the School District; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service upon the Agent for the Assessor; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service on the County Finance Director and the School District; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service upon the Agent for the Assessor; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Determination; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Complaint; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1); Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Goldman, P.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less