This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 03:00:53 (UTC).

J J G et al v. THE CITY OF NEW YORK et al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 J J G filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE CITY OF NEW YORK. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas P Aliotta. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Thomas P Aliotta

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jude Gracian Individually

J J G an infant by his father and natural guardian, JUDE GRACIAN

Defendants

THE CITY OF NEW YORK

NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GINSBERG, MARTIN L

Attorney at MARTIN L GINSBERG ESQ

Defendant Attorneys

Counsel, Corporation

Attorney at New York City Corporation Counsel

BRODERICK, ANN

Attorney at OFFICE OF CORPORATION COUNSEL STATEN ISLAND TORTS

FAMULARI, GIANNA M.

Attorney at New York City Law Department, Staten Island Tort Office

 

Court Documents

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

ORDER - OTHER IN-CAMERA

ORDER - OTHER IN-CAMERA; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/05/2019; Received: 12/05/2019

NOTICE OF HARD COPY EXHIBIT FILING

NOTICE OF HARD COPY EXHIBIT FILING; Filed By: Famulari, G.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/02/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Ginsberg, M. - filed by Disponzio Lwayers Service; Filed: 03/30/2019; Received: 03/30/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ginsberg, M. - filed by Disponzio Lwayers Service; Filed: 03/30/2019; Received: 03/30/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Ginsberg, M. - filed by Disponzio Lwayers Service; Filed: 03/30/2019; Received: 03/30/2019

ANSWER Answer

ANSWER Answer; Filed By: Schwartz, P.; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ginsberg, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/07/2019; Received: 02/07/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Ginsberg, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/07/2019; Received: 02/07/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Ginsberg, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/07/2019; Received: 02/07/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ginsberg, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ginsberg, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/22/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER IN-CAMERA; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/05/2019; Received: 12/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HARD COPY EXHIBIT FILING; Filed By: Famulari, G.; Filed: 10/07/2019; Received: 10/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/02/2019; Received: 10/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Ginsberg, M. - filed by Disponzio Lwayers Service; Filed: 03/30/2019; Received: 03/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ginsberg, M. - filed by Disponzio Lwayers Service; Filed: 03/30/2019; Received: 03/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Ginsberg, M. - filed by Disponzio Lwayers Service; Filed: 03/30/2019; Received: 03/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer; Filed By: Schwartz, P.; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ginsberg, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/07/2019; Received: 02/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Ginsberg, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/07/2019; Received: 02/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Ginsberg, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 02/07/2019; Received: 02/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ginsberg, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ginsberg, M. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 01/18/2019; Received: 01/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less