This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 13:54:03 (UTC).

J C et al - v. - THE CITY OF NEW YORK et al

Case Summary

On 06/28/2017 J C filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE CITY OF NEW YORK. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******017E

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lakisha Cuevas individually

J C an infant by her mother and natural guardian LAKISHA CUEVAS

Defendants

THE CITY OF NEW YORK

NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF PARKS AND RECREATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVINE, ANDREW J

Attorney at RAPHAELSON & LEVINE LAW FIRM, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

Counsel, Corporation

Attorney at New York City Corporation Counsel

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - OTHER

STIPULATION - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 04/30/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 04/30/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 11/27/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 11/27/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/03/2018; Received: 12/03/2018

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Levine, A.; Filed: 09/20/2018; Received: 09/20/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levine, A.; Filed: 09/20/2018; Received: 09/20/2018

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Levine, A.; Filed: 09/20/2018; Received: 09/20/2018

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Levine, A.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Levine, A. - filed by Executive Attorney Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levine, A. - filed by Executive Attorney Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levine, A. - filed by Executive Attorney Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levine, A. - filed by Executive Attorney Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Levine, A.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2019; Received: 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 04/30/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/08/2019; Received: 05/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 11/27/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/03/2018; Received: 12/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Levine, A.; Filed: 09/20/2018; Received: 09/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levine, A.; Filed: 09/20/2018; Received: 09/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Levine, A.; Filed: 09/20/2018; Received: 09/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Levine, A.; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Levine, A. - filed by Executive Attorney Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levine, A. - filed by Executive Attorney Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levine, A. - filed by Executive Attorney Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Levine, A. - filed by Executive Attorney Service, Inc.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Levine, A.; Filed: 06/28/2017; Received: 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less