This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 10:06:21 (UTC).

Ivan Piterson-Assy et al - v. - Carl T. Osbourne et al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2017 Ivan Piterson-Assy filed an Other lawsuit against Carl T Osbourne. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is John R Higgitt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******017E

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

John R Higgitt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ivan Piterson-assy

Jellin M. Morera-ovalle

Defendants

Masawal Mohammad

Carl T. Osbourne

Coca Cola Refreshments USA

Not Yet Classified

Cartiglia Connolly & Russo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PAVLOUNIS, THEODORE

Attorney at PAVLOUNIS & SFOUGGATAKIS LLP

SFOUGGATAKIS, ANDREW GEORGE

Attorney at PAVLOUNIS & SFOUGGATAKIS, LLP.

SFOUGGATAKIS, ANDREW G

Attorney at PAVLOUNIS & SFOUGGATAKIS, LLP

Defendant Attorney

SAAB, KAREN

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla, LLP

Not Yet Classified Attorney

NOLAN, LYNNE MARY

Attorney at CARTIGLIA, CONNOLLY & RUSSO

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Pleadings in Action #2

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Pleadings in Action #2; Filed By: Saab, K.; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Pleadings in Action #1

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Pleadings in Action #1; Filed By: Saab, K.; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #003)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #003); Filed By: Saab, K.; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003); Filed By: Saab, K.; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Summons & Complaint & Answer in Action #2

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Summons & Complaint & Answer in Action #2; Filed By: Nolan, L.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Summons & Complaint & Answer in Action #1

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Summons & Complaint & Answer in Action #1; Filed By: Nolan, L.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002); Filed By: Nolan, L.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Nolan, L.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED NOVEMBER 15, 2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED NOVEMBER 15, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Pavlounis, T. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Pavlounis, T. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Pavlounis, T. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Pavlounis, T. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Pavlounis, T. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Saab, K.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Saab, K.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sfouggatakis, A. - filed by Pavlounis & Sfouggatakis, LLP; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sfouggatakis, A. - filed by Pavlounis & Sfouggatakis, LLP; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Pleadings in Action #2; Filed By: Saab, K.; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Pleadings in Action #1; Filed By: Saab, K.; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #003); Filed By: Saab, K.; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003); Filed By: Saab, K.; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Summons & Complaint & Answer in Action #2; Filed By: Nolan, L.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Summons & Complaint & Answer in Action #1; Filed By: Nolan, L.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002); Filed By: Nolan, L.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Nolan, L.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED NOVEMBER 15, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 07/19/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Pavlounis, T. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Pavlounis, T. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Pavlounis, T. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Pavlounis, T. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Pavlounis, T. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Pavlounis, T. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/08/2017; Received: 08/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Saab, K.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Saab, K.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sfouggatakis, A. - filed by Pavlounis & Sfouggatakis, LLP; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sfouggatakis, A. - filed by Pavlounis & Sfouggatakis, LLP; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less