This case was last updated from Tompkins County Courts on 08/09/2020 at 10:48:52 (UTC).

Ithaca Hotels, LLC a/k/a Holiday Inn Express v. County of Tompkins et al

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 Ithaca Hotels, LLC a/k/a Holiday Inn Express filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against County of Tompkins. This case was filed in Tompkins County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Gerald A Keene. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0299

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Tompkins County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Tompkins, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Gerald A Keene

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ithaca Hotels, LLC a/k/a Holiday Inn Express

Defendants

County of Tompkins

Tompkins County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEINMANN, PETER ALLEN

Attorney at Wolfgang & Weinmann

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff/person

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff/person; Filed By: Weinmann, P.; Filed: 07/24/2020; Received: 07/24/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff/mail

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff/mail; Filed By: Weinmann, P.; Filed: 07/24/2020; Received: 07/24/2020

MOTION (UPDATED RETURN DATE) (Motion #1a)

MOTION (UPDATED RETURN DATE) (Motion #1a); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/21/2020; Received: 07/21/2020

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/21/2020; Received: 07/21/2020

NOTICE OF PETITION (AMENDED) (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF PETITION (AMENDED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Weinmann, P.; Filed: 07/16/2020; Received: 07/16/2020

ASSIGNED RJI

ASSIGNED RJI; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/14/2020; Received: 07/14/2020

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Weinmann, P.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S)

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S); Filed By: Weinmann, P.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Weinmann, P.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff/person; Filed By: Weinmann, P.; Filed: 07/24/2020; Received: 07/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff/mail; Filed By: Weinmann, P.; Filed: 07/24/2020; Received: 07/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION (UPDATED RETURN DATE) (Motion #1a); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/21/2020; Received: 07/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/21/2020; Received: 07/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION (AMENDED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Weinmann, P.; Filed: 07/16/2020; Received: 07/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASSIGNED RJI; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/14/2020; Received: 07/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Weinmann, P.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1); Filed By: Weinmann, P.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Weinmann, P.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less