This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/09/2020 at 02:00:47 (UTC).

ISLAND VALET DEFINED BENEFIT PLAN - v. - DOUGLAS VAL ARENA et al

Case Summary

On 05/15/2017 ISLAND VALET DEFINED BENEFIT PLAN filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against DOUGLAS VAL ARENA. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ISLAND VALET DEFINED BENEFIT PLAN

Defendants

CDC UNITED LLC

Irving H Gradowski

POSITIVE BROADCASTING LLC

Douglas Val arena

Not Yet Classified

ONE WORLD JUDICIAL SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Yet Classified Attorney

MURTHA, TIMOTHY J

Attorney at ROACH & MURTHA P.C.

Defendant Attorney

MARRONE, GERARD MICHAEL

Attorney at THE MARRONE LAW GROUP, P.C.

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

COURT DECISION

AFFIRMATION

NOTICE OF ENTRY AND PROOF OF SERVICE

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

--none--

JUDGMENT

--none--

AFFIRMATION

Affirmation of lateness

EXHIBIT(S)

court decision

AFFIDAVIT

NON MILL AFF

BILL OF COSTS

BILL OF COSTS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

--none--

NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A COURT DECISION; Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION NOTICE OF ENTRY AND PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/12/2018; Received: 10/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation of lateness; Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 10/03/2018; Received: 10/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A court decision; Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 09/24/2018; Received: 09/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NON MILL AFF; Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 09/24/2018; Received: 09/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS BILL OF COSTS; Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 09/24/2018; Received: 09/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT Notice of settlement with notice of entry and AOS; Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 09/24/2018; Received: 09/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001); Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 10/23/2017; Received: 10/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 10/23/2017; Received: 10/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 10/23/2017; Received: 10/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 10/23/2017; Received: 10/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Murtha, T. - filed by Cortina, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Murtha, T. - filed by Cortina, S.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Murtha, T. - filed by Cortina, S.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Murtha, T. - filed by Cortina, S.; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Murtha, T. - filed by Cortina, S.; Filed: 05/22/2017; Received: 05/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Murtha, T.; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less