This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 10/13/2021 at 09:46:56 (UTC).

Island Painting, Inc. v. Vanguard Construction and Development Company, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 Island Painting, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Vanguard Construction and Development Company, Inc. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2021

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Island Painting, Inc.

Defendants

Vanguard Construction and Development Company, Inc.

Community Healthcare Network Inc. f/k/a Community Family Planning Council

John Doe #1 through John Doe # 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERTZ, KAREN M.

Attorney at Hertz Legal, PC

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 10/07/2021; Received: 10/07/2021

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 09/29/2021; Received: 09/29/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - C summons and complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - C summons and complaint; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 09/29/2021; Received: 09/29/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - B Proof of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - B Proof of Service; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 09/29/2021; Received: 09/29/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A Mechanics Lien

EXHIBIT(S) - A Mechanics Lien; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 09/29/2021; Received: 09/29/2021

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 09/29/2021; Received: 09/29/2021

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 09/29/2021; Received: 09/29/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 09/09/2021; Received: 09/09/2021

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 09/09/2021; Received: 09/09/2021

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

CONSENT TO EFILING Notice of Efiling

CONSENT TO EFILING Notice of Efiling; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 08/04/2021; Received: 08/04/2021

CONSENT TO EFILING Notice of Efiling

CONSENT TO EFILING Notice of Efiling; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - B Proof of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - B Proof of Service; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A Lien

EXHIBIT(S) - A Lien; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 10/07/2021; Received: 10/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 09/29/2021; Received: 09/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C summons and complaint; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 09/29/2021; Received: 09/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Proof of Service; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 09/29/2021; Received: 09/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Mechanics Lien; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 09/29/2021; Received: 09/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 09/29/2021; Received: 09/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 09/29/2021; Received: 09/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO EFILING Notice of Efiling; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 08/04/2021; Received: 08/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO EFILING Notice of Efiling; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Proof of Service; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Lien; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Hertz, K.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less