Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 12:36:59 (UTC).

Isabel Garcia-Reynozo - v. - Paul C McLaughlin

Case Summary

On 05/19/2017 Isabel Garcia-Reynozo filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Paul C McLaughlin. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Isabel Garcia-reynozo

Defendant

Paul C Mclaughlin

Not Yet Classified

Dupee Monroe PC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Plaintiff Attorney

MONROE, JAMES EDWARD

Attorney at DUPEE & MONROE P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

HAYNES, EDWARD CHARLES

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

FALVEY, STEPHEN P

Attorney at Worby Vecchio & Edelman

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Fully executed Stipulation of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Fully executed Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Haynes, E.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2019; Received: 01/16/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Declaration of Plaintiff

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Declaration of Plaintiff; Filed By: Monroe, J.; Filed: 10/05/2018; Received: 10/05/2018

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Reply

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Reply; Filed By: Monroe, J.; Filed: 10/05/2018; Received: 10/05/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Falvey, S.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Falvey, S.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/27/2018; Received: 09/27/2018

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service of Motion and Affirmation

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service of Motion and Affirmation; Filed By: Monroe, J.; Filed: 09/26/2018; Received: 09/26/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Defendant's EBT Transcript

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Defendant's EBT Transcript; Filed By: Monroe, J.; Filed: 09/26/2018; Received: 09/26/2018

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Falvey, S.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Falvey, S.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Falvey, S.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Falvey, S.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Falvey, S.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service of Defendant

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service of Defendant; Filed By: Monroe, J.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Monroe, J.; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Fully executed Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Haynes, E.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/16/2019; Received: 01/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Declaration of Plaintiff; Filed By: Monroe, J.; Filed: 10/05/2018; Received: 10/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Reply; Filed By: Monroe, J.; Filed: 10/05/2018; Received: 10/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Falvey, S.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Falvey, S.; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/27/2018; Received: 09/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service of Motion and Affirmation; Filed By: Monroe, J.; Filed: 09/26/2018; Received: 09/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Defendant's EBT Transcript; Filed By: Monroe, J.; Filed: 09/26/2018; Received: 09/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Plaintiff's EBT Transcript; Filed By: Monroe, J.; Filed: 09/26/2018; Received: 09/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Falvey, S.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Falvey, S.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Falvey, S.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Falvey, S.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Falvey, S.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service of Defendant; Filed By: Monroe, J.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Monroe, J.; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less