This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:12:20 (UTC).

ISABEL CEPEDA et al - v. - TEH LING HSIEH et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 ISABEL CEPEDA filed an Other lawsuit against TEH LING HSIEH. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Defendants and Plaintiffs

Marien Martinez

Isabel Cepeda

Santa Bourdier

S.T.V. TRANSPORTATION CORP.

Teh ling Hsieh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WELLERSTEIN, HEDVA

Attorney at HEDVA WELLERSTEIN

GOLDBERG, AVRAHAM YESHAYAHU

Attorney at Avraham Goldberg

Defendant Attorneys

ROSVOLOS, PARIS THEODORE

Attorney at Brand, Glick and Brand, P.C.

LEVEN, ADRIANNE JOY

Attorney at BAKER, McEVOY, MORRISSEY & MOSKOVITS, PC

MORRISSEY, COLIN FRANCIS

Attorney at Colin F. Morrissey Esq/

HUNG, CYNTHIA WEN-TEI

Attorney at Nicoletti Gonson Spinner Ryan Gulino Pinter, LLP

YONG, JEFFREY P

Attorney at MARTYN TOHER MARTYN & ROSSI

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #5)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #5); Filed By: Rosvolos, P. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

ANSWER Answer and Demands

ANSWER Answer and Demands; Filed By: Yong, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #5) MRI reports - Feliz Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #5) MRI reports - Feliz Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Goldberg, A.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS

TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Yong, J.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #5) Narrative Report - Bourdier

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #5) Narrative Report - Bourdier; Filed By: Goldberg, A.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #5) Narrative Report - Feliz

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #5) Narrative Report - Feliz; Filed By: Goldberg, A.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #5) MRI reports for Bourdier Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #5) MRI reports for Bourdier Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Goldberg, A.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #5)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #5); Filed By: Rosvolos, P. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) RJI

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) RJI; Filed By: Yong, J.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #5) TO WITHDRAW MOTION

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #5) TO WITHDRAW MOTION; Filed By: Rosvolos, P. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Consolidate Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Consolidate Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Yong, J.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #5) TO WITHDRAW MOTION; Filed By: Rosvolos, P. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS; Filed By: Leven, A. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #5); Filed By: Rosvolos, P. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #5); Filed By: Rosvolos, P. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #5) Narrative Report - Feliz; Filed By: Goldberg, A.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #5) MRI reports - Feliz Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Goldberg, A.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #5) Narrative Report - Bourdier; Filed By: Goldberg, A.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #5) MRI reports for Bourdier Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Goldberg, A.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #5) Order in Ryerson v. Knuppel; Filed By: Goldberg, A.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) AND DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Morrissey, C. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) RJI; Filed By: Yong, J.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Yong, J.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Consolidate Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Yong, J.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer and Demands; Filed By: Yong, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H. - filed by Capital Process Servers, Inc.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wellerstein, H.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less