This case was last updated from Rockland County Courts on 02/16/2020 at 02:42:59 (UTC).

Ironshore Specialty Insurance Co - v. - Adams Law Firm PC

Case Summary

On 06/22/2017 Ironshore Specialty Insurance Co filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Adams Law Firm PC. This case was filed in Rockland County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Rockland County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Rockland, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ironshore Specialty Insurance Co

Defendant

Adams Law Firm PC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LEVINE, STEPHANIE RACHEL

Attorney at SCOTT K. LEVINE

JASLOW, HOWARD M

Attorney at PLATZER, SWERGOLD, LEVINE,GOLDBERG, KATZ & JASLOW, LLP

Defendant Attorney

ADAMS, JEFFREY M

Attorney at ADAMS LAW FIRM, P.C.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Levine, S.; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/31/2017; Received: 10/31/2017

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Adams, J.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Adams, J.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Summons, Complaint and Proposed Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Summons, Complaint and Proposed Answer; Filed By: Adams, J.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Correspondence

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Correspondence; Filed By: Adams, J.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Statement of Judgment

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Statement of Judgment; Filed By: Adams, J.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Adams, J.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001); Filed By: Adams, J.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on September 22, 2017

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on September 22, 2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Levine, S.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Levine, S.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Jaslow, H. - filed by AAA Attorney Service Co of NY; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Jaslow, H. - filed by AAA Attorney Service Co of NY; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Levine, S.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Levine, S.; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/31/2017; Received: 10/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Adams, J.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Adams, J.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Summons, Complaint and Proposed Answer; Filed By: Adams, J.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Correspondence; Filed By: Adams, J.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Statement of Judgment; Filed By: Adams, J.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Adams, J.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001); Filed By: Adams, J.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on September 22, 2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Levine, S.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Levine, S.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Jaslow, H. - filed by AAA Attorney Service Co of NY; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Jaslow, H. - filed by AAA Attorney Service Co of NY; Filed: 07/13/2017; Received: 07/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Levine, S.; Filed: 06/22/2017; Received: 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less