Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 03/19/2020 at 14:35:42 (UTC).

INSURANCE COMPANY OF GREATER NEW YORK as subrogee of GOLDEN ASSET LLC v. KSK LLC CONSTRUCTION GROUP et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2019 INSURANCE COMPANY OF GREATER NEW YORK as subrogee of GOLDEN ASSET LLC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against KSK LLC CONSTRUCTION GROUP. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INSURANCE COMPANY OF GREATER NEW YORK as subrogee of GOLDEN ASSET LLC

Defendants

DONATO INC.

KSK LLC CONSTRUCTION GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FINN, ROBERT J

Attorney at GWERTZMAN, LEFKOWITZ, BURMAN, SMITH & MARCUS

Defendant Attorney

MESSINA, CHRISTINE M

Attorney at GARTNER & BLOOM, P.C.

 

Court Documents

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE e-file and mailing

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE e-file and mailing; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D Notice of Default

EXHIBIT(S) - D Notice of Default; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit of James Leo

EXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit of James Leo; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B Affidavit of Service for Def, Donato

EXHIBIT(S) - B Affidavit of Service for Def, Donato; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A S&C

EXHIBIT(S) - A S&C Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION

NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service re. Notice of Deposition of Co-Defendant dated 01.29.2020

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service re. Notice of Deposition of Co-Defendant dated 01.29.2020; Filed By: Messina, C. - filed by Gartner Bloom P.C.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service re. KSK Combined Discovery Demands 01.29.2020

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service re. KSK Combined Discovery Demands 01.29.2020; Filed By: Messina, C. - filed by Gartner Bloom P.C.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

DEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands dated January 28, 2020

DEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands dated January 28, 2020; Filed By: Messina, C. - filed by Gartner Bloom P.C.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Electronic Filing Authorization dated 12.01.2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Electronic Filing Authorization dated 12.01.2017; Filed By: Messina, C. - filed by Gartner Bloom P.C.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service re KSK LLC Construction Group Verified Answer 01.29.2020

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service re KSK LLC Construction Group Verified Answer 01.29.2020; Filed By: Messina, C. - filed by Gartner Bloom P.C.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) KSK LLC Construction Group Verified Answer 01.29.2020

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) KSK LLC Construction Group Verified Answer 01.29.2020; Filed By: Messina, C. - filed by Gartner Bloom P.C.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 11/01/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 11/01/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE e-file and mailing; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Notice of Default; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit of James Leo; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Affidavit of Service for Def, Donato; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A S&C Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service re. Notice of Deposition of Co-Defendant dated 01.29.2020; Filed By: Messina, C. - filed by Gartner Bloom P.C.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION KSK Notice of Deposition of Co-Defendant 01.29.2020; Filed By: Messina, C. - filed by Gartner Bloom P.C.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION KSK Notice of Deposition of Plaintiff dated 01.28.2020; Filed By: Messina, C. - filed by Gartner Bloom P.C.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service re. KSK Combined Discovery Demands 01.29.2020; Filed By: Messina, C. - filed by Gartner Bloom P.C.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands dated January 28, 2020; Filed By: Messina, C. - filed by Gartner Bloom P.C.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Electronic Filing Authorization dated 12.01.2017; Filed By: Messina, C. - filed by Gartner Bloom P.C.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service re KSK LLC Construction Group Verified Answer 01.29.2020; Filed By: Messina, C. - filed by Gartner Bloom P.C.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) KSK LLC Construction Group Verified Answer 01.29.2020; Filed By: Messina, C. - filed by Gartner Bloom P.C.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 11/01/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Finn, R. - filed by Gwertzman Lefkowitz Smith Marcus & Sullivan; Filed: 11/01/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less