This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 03/02/2020 at 00:51:38 (UTC).

INNER LAKES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v. STEVEN A. ROBINSON

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 INNER LAKES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STEVEN A ROBINSON. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1057

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Chautauqua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INNER LAKES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

Steven A Robinson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OVERBECK, MELISSA LYNN

Attorney at CHIARI & ILECKI, LLP

OSTROWSKI, MELISSA

Attorney at Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - A military status

EXHIBIT(S) - A military status; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) military status

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) military status; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) affidavit of service

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) affidavit of service; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) attorney fee provision

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) attorney fee provision; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 11/16/2019; Received: 11/16/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 11/16/2019; Received: 11/16/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 08/14/2019; Received: 08/14/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) affidavit of mailing

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) affidavit of mailing; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) affidavit of facts

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) affidavit of facts; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) summons and complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) summons and complaint; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) attorney's affirmation

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) attorney's affirmation; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

NOTICE

NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A military status; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF NON EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF NON EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) affidavit of mailing; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) affidavit of facts; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) military status; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) attorney's affirmation; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 11/16/2019; Received: 11/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 11/16/2019; Received: 11/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 08/14/2019; Received: 08/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less