Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 00:57:53 (UTC).

INESSA LEVENBOOK-RONINSON v. IFTIKHAR L. DEAN et al

Case Summary

On 01/15/2019 INESSA LEVENBOOK-RONINSON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against IFTIKHAR L DEAN. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is James H Ferreira. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1-19

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Albany County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

Judge Details

Judge

James H Ferreira

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Inessa Levenbook-roninson

Defendants

"1" THROUGH "10" SAID NAMES BEING FICTITIOUS, IT BEING THE INTENTION TO NAME ALL INDIVIDUALS INVOLVE

John Doe and Jane Doe "1" through "10" said names being fictitious, it being the intention to name all individuals involved in the claims herein,

Iftikhar L. Dean

JANE DOE 1 - 10

JOHN DOE 1 - 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GRAY, JUSTIN WILLIAM

Attorney at Maynard, O'Connor, Smith & Catalinotto, LLP

SCHULTZ, BRIDGET MOLLY

Attorney at MAYNARD O'CONNOR SMITH & CATALINOTTO, LLP

Defendant Attorney

LITTLE, WILLIAM TYRONE

Attorney at W.T. LITTLE, PLLC

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT entered by clerk

JUDGMENT entered by clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Little, W.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

APPENDIX Enclosure to Letter [Stipulation of Settlement

APPENDIX Enclosure to Letter [Stipulation of Settlement; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

AFFIDAVIT Confession of Judgment

AFFIDAVIT Confession of Judgment; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) *Corrected*

JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G Deed

EXHIBIT(S) - G Deed; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 01/15/2019; Received: 01/15/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F 1/8/19 Letter - Cancel Contract

EXHIBIT(S) - F 1/8/19 Letter - Cancel Contract; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 01/15/2019; Received: 01/15/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E 12/10/18 Letter - TOE Closing Date

EXHIBIT(S) - E 12/10/18 Letter - TOE Closing Date; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 01/15/2019; Received: 01/15/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D 9/2/18 - 3 Day Notice

EXHIBIT(S) - D 9/2/18 - 3 Day Notice; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 01/15/2019; Received: 01/15/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C 1/7/14 Letter Set Closing Date

EXHIBIT(S) - C 1/7/14 Letter Set Closing Date; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 01/15/2019; Received: 01/15/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Contract of Sale

EXHIBIT(S) - B Contract of Sale; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 01/15/2019; Received: 01/15/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Lease

EXHIBIT(S) - A Lease; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 01/15/2019; Received: 01/15/2019

COMPLAINT Verified

COMPLAINT Verified; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 01/15/2019; Received: 01/15/2019

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 01/15/2019; Received: 01/15/2019

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT entered by clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Little, W.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPENDIX Enclosure to Letter [Stipulation of Settlement; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 12/19/2019; Received: 12/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Confession of Judgment; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 10/01/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER decision and order-entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPENDIX Application for Index Number; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 01/15/2019; Received: 01/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G Deed; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 01/15/2019; Received: 01/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F 1/8/19 Letter - Cancel Contract; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 01/15/2019; Received: 01/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E 12/10/18 Letter - TOE Closing Date; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 01/15/2019; Received: 01/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D 9/2/18 - 3 Day Notice; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 01/15/2019; Received: 01/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C 1/7/14 Letter Set Closing Date; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 01/15/2019; Received: 01/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Contract of Sale; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 01/15/2019; Received: 01/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Lease; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 01/15/2019; Received: 01/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Verified; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 01/15/2019; Received: 01/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 01/15/2019; Received: 01/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less