This case was last updated from Essex County Courts on 03/03/2020 at 00:09:45 (UTC).

INDIVIDUALLY BUT AS TRUSTEE FOR HILLDALE TRUST et al v. WILLIAM B. MARTIN et al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2019 INDIVIDUALLY BUT AS TRUSTEE FOR HILLDALE TRUST filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against WILLIAM B MARTIN. This case was filed in Essex County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0350

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Essex County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Essex, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

INDIVIDUALLY BUT AS TRUSTEE FOR HILLDALE TRUST

CHRISTIANA TRUST TR

HILLDALE TRUST

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY F S B DBA TR

Defendants

Phyllis B. Martin

William B. Martin

John Doe AND "JANE DOE" said names being fictitious, it being the intention of Plaintiff to designate any and all occupants of premises being foreclosed herein

Not Yet Classified

FEIN SUCH LAW GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

CASE, DAVID P

Attorney at RELIN, GOLDSTEIN & CRANE, L.L.P.

BROYLES, MARK K.

Attorney at Fein Such & Crane, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE TO DISCONTINUE ACTION, AFFIRMATION, CERTIFICATE OF SIGNATURE

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE TO DISCONTINUE ACTION, AFFIRMATION, CERTIFICATE OF SIGNATURE; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Non-Military Service

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Non-Military Service; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

AFFIDAVIT PHYLLIS B. MARTIN - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

AFFIDAVIT PHYLLIS B. MARTIN - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PHYLLIS B. MARTIN - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PHYLLIS B. MARTIN - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

AFFIDAVIT WILLIAM B. MARTIN - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

AFFIDAVIT WILLIAM B. MARTIN - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE WILLIAM B. MARTIN - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE WILLIAM B. MARTIN - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

AFFIDAVIT JOHN DOE AND JANE DOE - NO DOES - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

AFFIDAVIT JOHN DOE AND JANE DOE - NO DOES - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected* NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected* NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT *Corrected* CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT *Corrected* CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected* NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected* NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE TO DISCONTINUE ACTION, AFFIRMATION, CERTIFICATE OF SIGNATURE; Filed By: Case, D.; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation of Non-Military Service; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT PHYLLIS B. MARTIN - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PHYLLIS B. MARTIN - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT WILLIAM B. MARTIN - 3215 AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE WILLIAM B. MARTIN - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/05/2019; Received: 08/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT JOHN DOE AND JANE DOE - NO DOES - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE; Filed By: Broyles, M. - filed by Paper Chase NY, LLC; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected* NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT *Corrected* CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected* NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Broyles, M.; Filed: 07/19/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less