This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 21:55:09 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Petition of J.G. Wentworth Originations, LLC v. Genworth Life Insurance Company of New York et al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 In the Matter of the Petition of J G Wentworth Originations, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Genworth Life Insurance Company of New York. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Julia Rodriguez. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Julia Rodriguez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

In the Matter of the Petition of J.G. Wentworth Originations, LLC

Defendants

Genworth Life Insurance Company of New York

Mayflower Assignment Corporation

Jessica Butler As Interested Persons Pursuant to GOL 5-1701(f)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NESTOR, MICHAEL FRANCIS

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL F. NESTOR LLC

 

Court Documents

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E Prior Applications for Similar Relief

EXHIBIT(S) - E Prior Applications for Similar Relief; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #001)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #001); Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D Notice Letter

EXHIBIT(S) - D Notice Letter; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of Jessica Butler

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of Jessica Butler; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Statement of Professional Representation

EXHIBIT(S) - B Statement of Professional Representation; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Michael F. Nestor, Esq.

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Michael F. Nestor, Esq.; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Disclosure Statement

EXHIBIT(S) - B Disclosure Statement; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER & SIGNED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DATED 5/17/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER & SIGNED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DATED 5/17/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Disclosure Statement

EXHIBIT(S) - A Disclosure Statement; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Purchase Contract

EXHIBIT(S) - A Purchase Contract; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Evidence of Entitlement to Annuity

EXHIBIT(S) - C Evidence of Entitlement to Annuity; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

ORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER & SIGNED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DATED 5/17/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #001); Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Prior Applications for Similar Relief; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Notice Letter; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Evidence of Entitlement to Annuity; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Disclosure Statement; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Purchase Contract; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation of Michael F. Nestor, Esq.; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Statement of Professional Representation; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Disclosure Statement; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affidavit of Jessica Butler; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Nestor, M.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less