Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Madison County Courts on 03/20/2021 at 10:22:18 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Application ofVICTORIA JOY MONE,For Leave to Change Her Name toVICTORIA JOY BERKEY.

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 In the Matter of the Application ofVICTORIA JOY MONE,For Leave to Change Her Name toVICTORIA JOY BERKEY was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Madison County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald F Cerio. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1138

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Madison County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Madison, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Donald F Cerio

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Victoria Joy Mone

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROTHBART, MELISSA O'BRIEN

Attorney at Bond, Schoeneck & King PLLC

SCHEER, JEFFREY BRUCE

Attorney at BOND, SCHOENECK & KING, PLLC

 

Court Documents

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/01/2021; Received: 03/01/2021

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/23/2021; Received: 02/23/2021

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

ORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/19/2021

RJI -RE: 202.6(b) *Corrected*

RJI -RE: 202.6(b) *Corrected*; Filed By: Scheer, J.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) *Corrected*

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) *Corrected*; Filed By: Scheer, J.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) *Corrected*

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) *Corrected*; Filed By: Scheer, J.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 *Corrected* Copy of Birth Certificate Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 *Corrected* Copy of Birth Certificate Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Scheer, J.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

PETITION *Corrected*

PETITION *Corrected*; Filed By: Scheer, J.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/01/2021; Received: 03/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/23/2021; Received: 02/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: 202.6(b) *Corrected*; Filed By: Scheer, J.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) *Corrected*; Filed By: Scheer, J.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1) *Corrected*; Filed By: Scheer, J.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 *Corrected* Copy of Birth Certificate Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Scheer, J.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION *Corrected*; Filed By: Scheer, J.; Filed: 02/18/2021; Received: 02/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less