This case was last updated from Essex County New York Courts on 11/21/2021 at 13:49:49 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Application of Santander Bank, N.A. et al v. For an Order Cancelling of Record a Satisfaction of Mortgage Pursuant to New York Real Property Law Section 329

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 In the Matter of the Application of Santander Bank, N A filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against For an Order Cancelling of Record a Satisfaction of Mortgage Pursuant to New York Real Property Law Section 329. This case was filed in Essex County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Glen Bruening. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0135

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Essex, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Glen Bruening

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

In the Matter of the Application of Santander Bank, N.A.

Benjamin A. Leroy

Betsy J. Leroy

Defendant

For an Order Cancelling of Record a Satisfaction of Mortgage Pursuant to New York Real Property Law Section 329

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOSCANO, THOMAS A

 

Court Documents

PETITION Verified Petition to Cancel a Satisfaction of Mortgage of Record

PETITION Verified Petition to Cancel a Satisfaction of Mortgage of Record; Filed By: Toscano, T. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/19/2021; Received: 03/19/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A Affidavits of Owners in Support

EXHIBIT(S) - A Affidavits of Owners in Support; Filed By: Toscano, T. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/19/2021; Received: 03/19/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - B Title Report

EXHIBIT(S) - B Title Report; Filed By: Toscano, T. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/19/2021; Received: 03/19/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - C Copy of Deed

EXHIBIT(S) - C Copy of Deed; Filed By: Toscano, T. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/19/2021; Received: 03/19/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - D Copy of Satisfaction

EXHIBIT(S) - D Copy of Satisfaction; Filed By: Toscano, T. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/19/2021; Received: 03/19/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - E Affidavit of Lender in Support

EXHIBIT(S) - E Affidavit of Lender in Support; Filed By: Toscano, T. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/19/2021; Received: 03/19/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - F Affidavit of Service on Essex County Clerk

EXHIBIT(S) - F Affidavit of Service on Essex County Clerk; Filed By: Toscano, T. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/19/2021; Received: 03/19/2021

EXPARTE ORDER - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) Proposed Order Cancelling a Satisfaction of Mortgage of Record

EXPARTE ORDER - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) Proposed Order Cancelling a Satisfaction of Mortgage of Record; Filed By: Toscano, T. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/19/2021; Received: 03/19/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Toscano, T. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/19/2021; Received: 03/19/2021

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION; Filed By: Toscano, T. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/19/2021; Received: 03/19/2021

NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT Judicial assignment notice

NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT Judicial assignment notice; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2021; Received: 03/19/2021

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1)

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/20/2021; Received: 04/20/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/06/2021; Received: 05/07/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Toscano, T. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/07/2021; Received: 05/07/2021

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Toscano, T. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 05/07/2021; Received: 05/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/06/2021; Received: 05/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/20/2021; Received: 04/20/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPOINTMENT Judicial assignment notice; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2021; Received: 03/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION; Filed By: Toscano, T. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/19/2021; Received: 03/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Toscano, T. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/19/2021; Received: 03/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) Proposed Order Cancelling a Satisfaction of Mortgage of Record; Filed By: Toscano, T. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/19/2021; Received: 03/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Affidavit of Service on Essex County Clerk; Filed By: Toscano, T. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/19/2021; Received: 03/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Affidavit of Lender in Support; Filed By: Toscano, T. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/19/2021; Received: 03/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Copy of Satisfaction; Filed By: Toscano, T. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/19/2021; Received: 03/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Copy of Deed; Filed By: Toscano, T. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/19/2021; Received: 03/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Title Report; Filed By: Toscano, T. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/19/2021; Received: 03/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Affidavits of Owners in Support; Filed By: Toscano, T. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/19/2021; Received: 03/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION Verified Petition to Cancel a Satisfaction of Mortgage of Record; Filed By: Toscano, T. - filed by TMS Services, Inc.; Filed: 03/19/2021; Received: 03/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less