This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 06:01:19 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Application of PALACE FOODS, LLC, For a Judgment Pursuant to CPLR Article 75, Vacating a Final Arbitration Award dated June 2, 2017 - v. - FIBER GOURMET, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 In the Matter of the Application of PALACE FOODS, LLC, For a Judgment Pursuant to CPLR Article 75, Vacating a Final Arbitration Award dated June 2, 2017 filed an Other lawsuit against FIBER GOURMET, INC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Bernard J. Graham, Pt 36. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Bernard J. Graham, Pt 36

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

In the Matter of the Application of PALACE FOODS, LLC, For a Judgment Pursuant to CPLR Article 75, Vacating a Final Arbitration Award dated June 2, 2017

Defendants

FIBER GOURMET, INC.

MAUZONE MANIA, LLC

David Fried

Not Yet Classified

AABBEE LLC

Fay Josovitz ESQ.

Ronald D. Weiss, P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SILBER, MEYER Y

Attorney at THE SILBER LAW FIRM, LLC

PEDRAS, DANIELLE I

Attorney at The Silber Law Firm, LLC

Defendant Attorneys

D'ORAZIO, BERNARD

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF BERNARD D'ORAZIO & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

KAUPELIS, RYAN P

Attorney at SMITH, BUSS & JACOBS, LLP

KLASS, RICHARD A

Attorney at RICHARD KLASS ESQ

KOGAN, BORIS

Attorney at Boris Kogan & Associates

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

COHEN, NATHAN

Attorney at Jacobowitz Newman Tversky LLP

WEISS, RONALD D.

Attorney at RONALD WEISS, P.C. ATTORNEY AT LAW

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Weiss, R.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/27/2020

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Weiss, R.; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Regarding stipulation withdrawing pending contempt motion

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Regarding stipulation withdrawing pending contempt motion; Filed By: D'Orazio, B.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: D'Orazio, B.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #6) dated 1/7/2020

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #6) dated 1/7/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for 01/07/2020 Order

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for 01/07/2020 Order; Filed By: Cohen, N.; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #7) Exhibit B - Josovitz Subpoena

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #7) Exhibit B - Josovitz Subpoena; Filed By: Cohen, N.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #7) Exhibit A - AABBEE Subpoena

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #7) Exhibit A - AABBEE Subpoena; Filed By: Cohen, N.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #7)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #7); Filed By: Cohen, N.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Mauzone Mania LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Mauzone Mania LLC; Filed By: Pedras, D.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)

ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C); Filed By: Silber, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Silber, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION *Corrected* RJI + Revised Comm Div Addendum

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION *Corrected* RJI + Revised Comm Div Addendum; Filed By: Silber, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Silber, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Final Award

EXHIBIT(S) - B Final Award; Filed By: Silber, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Interim Award

EXHIBIT(S) - A Interim Award; Filed By: Silber, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1); Filed By: Silber, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Silber, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

103 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Weiss, R.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Weiss, R.; Filed: 02/26/2020; Received: 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Regarding stipulation withdrawing pending contempt motion; Filed By: D'Orazio, B.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: D'Orazio, B.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #6) dated 1/7/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for 01/07/2020 Order; Filed By: Cohen, N.; Filed: 01/08/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #7) Exhibit B - Josovitz Subpoena; Filed By: Cohen, N.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #7) Exhibit A - AABBEE Subpoena; Filed By: Cohen, N.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #7); Filed By: Cohen, N.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #7); Filed By: Cohen, N.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Fiber Gourmet; Filed By: Pedras, D.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Mauzone Mania LLC; Filed By: Pedras, D.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C); Filed By: Silber, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Silber, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION *Corrected* RJI + Revised Comm Div Addendum; Filed By: Silber, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Silber, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Final Award; Filed By: Silber, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Interim Award; Filed By: Silber, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1); Filed By: Silber, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Silber, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less