This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 03/21/2020 at 23:45:18 (UTC).

In the matter of The Application of JOSE EDUARDO SUCONOTA v. TWIN SYCAMORE LLC

Case Summary

On 12/09/2019 In the matter of The Application of JOSE EDUARDO SUCONOTA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against TWIN SYCAMORE LLC. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Orange, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

In the matter of The Application of JOSE EDUARDO SUCONOTA

Defendant

TWIN SYCAMORE LLC

Not Yet Classified

Nicoletti & Harris, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Yet Classified Attorney

gastman, gregory

Defendant Attorney

MAZZEI, ROBERT M

 

Court Documents

PETITION *Corrected* Petition

PETITION *Corrected* Petition; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) Order To Show Cause; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

AFFIRMATION Affirmation

AFFIRMATION Affirmation; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Petitioner's Affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Petitioner's Affidavit; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement Of Authorization

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement Of Authorization; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Request For Judicial Intervention

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Request For Judicial Intervention; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #001) Fully Executed Stip. to Adjourn OTSC

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #001) Fully Executed Stip. to Adjourn OTSC; Filed By: Mazzei, R.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #001)

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #001)

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #001); Filed By: Mazzei, R.; Filed: 03/02/2020; Received: 03/02/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #001); Filed By: Mazzei, R.; Filed: 03/02/2020; Received: 03/02/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/06/2020; Received: 01/06/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #001) Fully Executed Stip. to Adjourn OTSC; Filed By: Mazzei, R.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/12/2019; Received: 12/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Request For Judicial Intervention; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement Of Authorization; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Petitioner's Affidavit; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #001) Order To Show Cause; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION *Corrected* Petition; Filed By: Gastman, G. - filed by United Lawyers Service Inc.; Filed: 12/09/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer gastman, gregory