Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 21:06:45 (UTC).

In the Matter of the application of G.V. v. For leave to settle personal injury and sum claims

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 In the Matter of the application of G filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against v For leave to settle personal injury and sum claims. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Maria S Vazquezdoles. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Maria S Vazquezdoles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

In the Matter of the application of G.V. by his m/n/g Sabrina Maldonado

Defendant

For leave to settle personal injury and sum claims

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUBIN, HERBERT S

Attorney at SUBIN ASSOCIATES, LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER - INFANT COMPROMISE

ORDER - INFANT COMPROMISE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

RJI -RE: INFANT'S COMPROMISE

RJI -RE: INFANT'S COMPROMISE; Filed By: Subin, H. - filed by Subin Associates, LLP; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E Request for Reimbursement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - E Request for Reimbursement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Subin, H. - filed by Subin Associates, LLP; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Subin, H. - filed by Subin Associates, LLP; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D medical records Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - D medical records Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Subin, H. - filed by Subin Associates, LLP; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Medical records Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C Medical records Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Subin, H. - filed by Subin Associates, LLP; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Email exchange on 2/5/2019 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Email exchange on 2/5/2019 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Subin, H. - filed by Subin Associates, LLP; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Letter from GEICO dated 2/6/2018 with offer of $25,000

EXHIBIT(S) - A Letter from GEICO dated 2/6/2018 with offer of $25,000; Filed By: Subin, H. - filed by Subin Associates, LLP; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

AFFIRMATION Physician's Affirmation Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION Physician's Affirmation Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Subin, H. - filed by Subin Associates, LLP; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

AFFIDAVIT Mother's Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT Mother's Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Subin, H. - filed by Subin Associates, LLP; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Subin, H. - filed by Subin Associates, LLP; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

INFANT COMPROMISE ORDER (PROPOSED)

INFANT COMPROMISE ORDER (PROPOSED); Filed By: Subin, H. - filed by Subin Associates, LLP; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

PETITION Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

PETITION Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Subin, H. - filed by Subin Associates, LLP; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - INFANT COMPROMISE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: INFANT'S COMPROMISE; Filed By: Subin, H. - filed by Subin Associates, LLP; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Request for Reimbursement Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Subin, H. - filed by Subin Associates, LLP; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Subin, H. - filed by Subin Associates, LLP; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D medical records Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Subin, H. - filed by Subin Associates, LLP; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Medical records Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Subin, H. - filed by Subin Associates, LLP; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Email exchange on 2/5/2019 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Subin, H. - filed by Subin Associates, LLP; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Letter from GEICO dated 2/6/2018 with offer of $25,000; Filed By: Subin, H. - filed by Subin Associates, LLP; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Physician's Affirmation Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Subin, H. - filed by Subin Associates, LLP; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Mother's Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Subin, H. - filed by Subin Associates, LLP; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Subin, H. - filed by Subin Associates, LLP; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFANT COMPROMISE ORDER (PROPOSED); Filed By: Subin, H. - filed by Subin Associates, LLP; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Subin, H. - filed by Subin Associates, LLP; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less