This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:12:28 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Application of GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY to Stay Arbitration - v. - ANGER PASCAL et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 In the Matter of the Application of GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY to Stay Arbitration filed an Other lawsuit against ANGER PASCAL. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

In the Matter of the Application of GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY to Stay Arbitration

Defendants

Jefferson Louis Proposed Additional Respondent

Gboulou Okoto Proposed Additional Respondent

Anger Pascal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LINDER, MARK

Attorney at HARMON, LINDER & ROGOWSKY, ESQS.

DIMAGGIO, ADRIANA

Attorney at Law Office of Gail S. Lauzon

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER dtd 5/17/18 (Attached with JHO/Special Ref order)

ORDER - OTHER dtd 5/17/18 (Attached with JHO/Special Ref order); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/21/2018; Received: 05/29/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service; Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 05/23/2018; Received: 05/23/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 12/19/2017; Received: 12/19/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Order

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Order; Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 12/19/2017; Received: 12/19/2017

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry; Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 12/19/2017; Received: 12/19/2017

ORDER - OTHER dtd 12/7/17

ORDER - OTHER dtd 12/7/17; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/11/2017; Received: 12/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 09/27/2017; Received: 09/27/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply affirmation

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply affirmation; Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 09/27/2017; Received: 09/27/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 09/27/2017; Received: 09/27/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Supplemental Affirmation in Support

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Supplemental Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C UM Endorsement

EXHIBIT(S) - C UM Endorsement; Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Police Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Police Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Demand for Arb

EXHIBIT(S) - A Demand for Arb; Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1) Notice of Petition

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1) Notice of Petition; Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

PETITION Petition

PETITION Petition; Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service; Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 05/23/2018; Received: 05/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dtd 5/17/18 (Attached with JHO/Special Ref order); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/21/2018; Received: 05/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 12/19/2017; Received: 12/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Order; Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 12/19/2017; Received: 12/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry; Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 12/19/2017; Received: 12/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dtd 12/7/17; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/11/2017; Received: 12/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 09/27/2017; Received: 09/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply affirmation; Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 09/27/2017; Received: 09/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Linder, M.; Filed: 09/27/2017; Received: 09/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) PA plate check; Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Supplemental Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C UM Endorsement; Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Police Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Demand for Arb; Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1) Notice of Petition; Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION Petition; Filed By: Dimaggio, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less