This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 18:39:47 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF THE APPLICATION OF GERSON AGOSTINI AND BELINDA AGOSTINI FOR AN ORDER CANCELLING OF RECORD A MORTGAGE PURSUANT TO NEW YORK REAL PROPERTY LAW SECTION 329 - v. - N/A

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 IN THE MATTER OF THE APPLICATION OF GERSON AGOSTINI AND BELINDA AGOSTINI FOR AN ORDER CANCELLING OF RECORD A MORTGAGE PURSUANT TO NEW YORK REAL PROPERTY LAW SECTION 329 filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against N/A. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IN THE MATTER OF THE APPLICATION OF GERSON AGOSTINI AND BELINDA AGOSTINI FOR AN ORDER CANCELLING OF RECORD A MORTGAGE PURSUANT TO NEW YORK REAL PROPERTY LAW SECTION 329

Defendant

N/A

Not Yet Classified

SUFFOLK COUNTY CLERK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANGELO, JANET M

Attorney at PULEO DELISLE PLLC

Not Yet Classified Attorney

PETROWSKI, JOHN RICHARD

Attorney at Brody O'Connor & O'Connor

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos american money centers

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos american money centers; Filed By: Dangelo, J. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C AFFIDAVITS OF PETITIONERS

EXHIBIT(S) - C AFFIDAVITS OF PETITIONERS; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Dangelo, J. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE THE SUFFOLK COUNTY CLERK

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE THE SUFFOLK COUNTY CLERK; Filed By: Dangelo, J. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D LENDER AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT

EXHIBIT(S) - D LENDER AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

ORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A MORTGAGE

EXHIBIT(S) - A MORTGAGE; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B DEED

EXHIBIT(S) - B DEED; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #001); Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

ORDER - WITH COUNTY CLERK DIRECTIVE (Motion #001)

ORDER - WITH COUNTY CLERK DIRECTIVE (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/06/2017; Received: 11/06/2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Petrowski, J.; Filed: 10/04/2017; Received: 10/04/2017

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - WITH COUNTY CLERK DIRECTIVE (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/06/2017; Received: 11/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Petrowski, J.; Filed: 10/04/2017; Received: 10/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos american money centers; Filed By: Dangelo, J. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Dangelo, J. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE THE SUFFOLK COUNTY CLERK; Filed By: Dangelo, J. - filed by Nationwide Court Services, Inc.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #001); Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D LENDER AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C AFFIDAVITS OF PETITIONERS; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B DEED; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A MORTGAGE; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Dangelo, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less