Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 20:25:02 (UTC).

In Re The Matter of and Application For Court Approval of the Sale and Transfer of Certain Structured Settlement Payment Rights of J Rodriguez pursuant to and In Accordance with Gen Oblig Law 5 1701 et seq v. None

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 In Re The Matter of and Application For Court Approval of the Sale and Transfer of Certain Structured Settlement Payment Rights of J Rodriguez pursuant to and In Accordance with Gen Oblig Law 5 1701 et seq filed an Other lawsuit against None. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise Ann Hartman. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6-19

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Albany County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Denise Ann Hartman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IN RE THE MATTER OF AND APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF THE SALE AND TRANSFER OF CERTAIN STRUCTURE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRANDIMARTE, LUIGI

Attorney at SACCO & FILLAS, LLP ATTORNEYS AT LAW

Other Attorneys

LINDY, JOSHUA DAVID

Attorney at FitzGerald Morris Baker Firth PC

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER entered by the clerk

ORDER - OTHER entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/11/2019; Received: 03/11/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Lindy, J.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Amended

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Amended; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Disclosure Statement (Prudential)

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Disclosure Statement (Prudential); Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Disclosure Statement (John Hancock)

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Disclosure Statement (John Hancock); Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Purchase and Sale Agreement (Prudential)

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Purchase and Sale Agreement (Prudential); Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Purchase and Sale Agreement (John Hancock)

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Purchase and Sale Agreement (John Hancock); Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G IPA

EXHIBIT(S) - G IPA; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F Payee's Affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - F Payee's Affidavit; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E Disclosure Statement (Prudential)

EXHIBIT(S) - E Disclosure Statement (Prudential); Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D Disclosure Statement (John Hancock)

EXHIBIT(S) - D Disclosure Statement (John Hancock); Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Purchase and Sale Agreement (Prudential)

EXHIBIT(S) - C Purchase and Sale Agreement (Prudential); Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Purchase and Sale Agreement (John Hancock)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Purchase and Sale Agreement (John Hancock); Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Payee's List of Dependents

EXHIBIT(S) - A Payee's List of Dependents; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED); Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/11/2019; Received: 03/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Lindy, J.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED entered by the clerk; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Amended; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 Disclosure Statement (Prudential); Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 Disclosure Statement (John Hancock); Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 Purchase and Sale Agreement (Prudential); Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Purchase and Sale Agreement (John Hancock); Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Further Affirmation in Support of Petition; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H SSPA; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G IPA; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Payee's Affidavit; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Disclosure Statement (Prudential); Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Disclosure Statement (John Hancock); Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Purchase and Sale Agreement (Prudential); Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Purchase and Sale Agreement (John Hancock); Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Payee's List of Dependents; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED); Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Brandimarte, L.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less